FRANKLIN et al v. OCWEN LOAN et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Franklin and William J. Franklin
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-13 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated December, DEUTSCHE BANK, CITI-GROUP and OCWEN LOAN
Case Number: 3:2018cv13284
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/25/2018. (mmh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from William J. Franklin wishing to withdraw the Complaint. (mmh)
October 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITI-GROUP. (BRENNER, SCOTT)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by CITI-GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Memorandum of Law, #12 Certification of Service)(BRENNER, SCOTT)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant Citigroup, Inc.'s time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 10/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/19/2018. (mps)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer Complaint by CITI-GROUP. (BRENNER, SCOTT)
September 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss by DEUTSCHE BANK, OCWEN LOAN. Responses due by 10/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification)(FIALKOFF, KASSIA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT BRADLEY BRENNER on behalf of CITI-GROUP (BRENNER, SCOTT)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEUTSCHE BANK identifying Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FIALKOFF, KASSIA)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCWEN LOAN identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FIALKOFF, KASSIA)
August 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OCWEN LOAN, DEUTSCHE BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/13/2018. (jem)
August 30, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (FIALKOFF, KASSIA)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART I. SEIDEN on behalf of OCWEN LOAN, DEUTSCHE BANK. (SEIDEN, STUART)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OCWEN LOAN, DEUTSCHE BANK from Superior Court, Monmouth County, case number Mon-L-002786-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8985243), filed by OCWEN LOAN, DEUTSCHE BANK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(FIALKOFF, KASSIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANKLIN et al v. OCWEN LOAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl A. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee of Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2003-13 Under the Pooling and Servicing Agreement Dated December
Represented By: KASSIA FIALKOFF
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEUTSCHE BANK
Represented By: KASSIA FIALKOFF
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI-GROUP
Represented By: SCOTT BRADLEY BRENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN
Represented By: STUART I. SEIDEN
Represented By: KASSIA FIALKOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?