NATASHA DENONA TRADING, LTD et al v. CAPACITY LLC
Plaintiff: NATASHA DENONA TRADING, LTD
Defendant: CAPACITY LLC, JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and CAPACITY L.L.C.
3Rd Party Defendant: YRC FREIGHT, INC. and YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CAPACITY, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv13631
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 Letter re #14 Letter. (BRATSPIES, JOSHUA)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Thomas C. Martin, Esq.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CAPACITY L.L.C., CAPACITY, LLC. re #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arlen Fish, #2 Exhibit A to the Fish Certification)(BRATSPIES, JOSHUA)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (MARTIN, THOMAS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CAPACITY, LLC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint (BRATSPIES, JOSHUA)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. re #9 MOTION to Remand (MARTIN, THOMAS)
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
October 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by CAPACITY L.L.C., CAPACITY, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BRATSPIES, JOSHUA)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for November 26, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff has until 11/7/2018 to respond to YRC's Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/2/2018. (km)
September 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MARTIN, THOMAS)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2018 03:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/10/2018. (km)
September 10, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kas, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of YRC FREIGHT, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of YRC FREIGHT, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YRC FREIGHT, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YRC FREIGHT, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-3940-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9006037), filed by YRC FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATASHA DENONA TRADING, LTD et al v. CAPACITY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATASHA DENONA TRADING, LTD
Represented By: RICHARD ARMEN MCOMBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: YRC FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPACITY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPACITY L.L.C.
Represented By: JOSHUA S. BRATSPIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CAPACITY, LLC.
Represented By: JOSHUA S. BRATSPIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?