BRADSHAW v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: MARLON E. BRADSHAW, SR.
Defendant: DOUGLAS LEONARD, MD, FRANCIS W. MEO, MD, DONIQUE IVERY, APN, MEGAN KLANSKY, DO, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY CORR. HEALTH CARE, RUTGERS UNIVERSITY BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CARE, MANUEL O. GARCIA, MD, GAYLE KESSELMAN, MD, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, IHUOMA NWACHUKWU, MD and G. HRISHIKESAN, DBC
Case Number: 3:2018cv14089
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 COMPLAINT, filed by MARLON E. BRADSHAW, SR.(mps)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall reopen the matter. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Complaint shall be filed. Summons shall not issue at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/2/2018. (mps)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by MARLON E. BRADSHAW, SR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope)(mps)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. The Clerk shall administratively terminate this case. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff the form entitled Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification (Civil Rights)(DNJ ProSe 007 A (Rev. 5/13)). If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the Court, in writing, within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk shall serve this Order upon Plaintiff by regular mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/28/2018. (mps)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Appendix, #4 Remedies, #5 Envelope)(jmh) Modified on 9/24/2018 (jmh). Modified on 9/25/2018 to "Complaint Received." (gxh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADSHAW v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS LEONARD, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS W. MEO, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONIQUE IVERY, APN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGAN KLANSKY, DO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTGERS UNIVERSITY CORR. HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUTGERS UNIVERSITY BEHAVIORAL HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANUEL O. GARCIA, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAYLE KESSELMAN, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHUOMA NWACHUKWU, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. HRISHIKESAN, DBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLON E. BRADSHAW, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?