BARRY v. KOSKINEN et al
Petitioner: JOHN BARRY, JR.
Respondent: MARY ANN ACONE, ELBA Y. PORRATADORIA, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN and JOHN KOSKINEN
Case Number: 3:2018cv14276
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARRY, JR. JOHN KOSKINEN served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (mmh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARRY, JR. MARY ANN ACONE served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (mmh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARRY, JR. STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (mmh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN BARRY, JR. ELBA Y. PORRATADORIA served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (mmh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOHN BARRY, JR as to STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN. (mmh)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by JOHN BARRY, JR as to MARY ANN ACONE. (mmh)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARY ANN ACONE, JOHN KOSKINEN, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, ELBA Y. PORRATADORIA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summons sent via USPS on 9/27/2018 (jmh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR GREAT WRIT OF MANDAMUS against MARY ANN ACONE, JOHN KOSKINEN, STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN, ELBA Y. PORRATADORIA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM009970), filed by JOHN BARRY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARRY v. KOSKINEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARY ANN ACONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ELBA Y. PORRATADORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN TERNER MNUCHIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN KOSKINEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN BARRY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?