NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC. v. MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC.
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv14563
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 12/17/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/16/2018. (km)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to Clerk of the Court, William T. Walsh requesting adjournment of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (KLUSKA, DANIEL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JARED KLUSKA on behalf of NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC. (KLUSKA, DANIEL)
November 8, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (SULLIVAN, BRIAN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, BRIAN)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. identifying Mazda Motor Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SULLIVAN, BRIAN)
October 24, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/8/2018. (km)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mazda Motor of America, Inc... (SULLIVAN, BRIAN)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Case served on mazda Motor of America, Inc on October 4, 2018, filed by NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC.. (BRAUTH, MARVIN)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
October 2, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC.. (BRAUTH, MARVIN)
October 2, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This complaint has previously been opened as 3:18-cv-14560. In the event an error is made during the case opening process please call (609)989-2065 for assistance. DO NOT create a new case . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9064708), filed by NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BRAUTH, MARVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC. v. MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN D. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY COALITION OF AUTOMOTIVE RETAILERS, INC.
Represented By: MARVIN J. BRAUTH
Represented By: DANIEL JARED KLUSKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?