Gibson et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Mento, Randa Foda, Anna Arroyo, Donna R. Nelson, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, Janelle Stevens, William Robinson, Duncan Hails, Dan Breshears, Julia Griffith, Diane Goodin, Deshondra Salami, William Ayres, Jamie Gonzalez, Jodale Skinner, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Deborah L. Meara, Robert Kawelaske, Lea Deaton, Brent J. Christensen, Lois Arnstein, DONNA HALL, Steven Cynewski, TRACY WOOD, Jill Corbin, GREGORY SPEICHER, DONNA PETERSON, Dolores Hinojosa, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, HELEN JOHNSON, Susan Haluzak, RITA HOSTON, Marcia Mears, Michelle Hemmin, Tracie Scheftner, Walter Croxton, Andrea Heredia, David Vanness, Cynthia Gibson, Amy Frederick, Emmanuel Solidum, Kathleen Dukes, NANCY WHITE, Mary Ann Rutherford, Donal E. Endsley, Larry DiBattista, Cindy Rasmussen, Heidi Amiro, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Archie Wellman, Debbie Wynn, Paula Genovesi, Allen Prescott, Eva Foster, DANNY DAVIS, Juanita Hill, Raymond P. Coots, Francesca Beniquez, Tamika Clark, Alice Salas, Brenda Sue White and Trinity Kelly
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC, PTI Royston, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. and PTI Union, LLC
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2018cv14637
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #90 MOTION to Seal , #91 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 27, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION to Seal by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys Talc America, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant, PTI Union's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
November 27, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to Seal by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys Talc America, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Certain Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant, PTI Royston's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
November 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #84 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief to PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 45 Pages. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 19, 2018 Filing 89 Exhibit to #88 Response in Opposition to Motion, PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 31, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 19, 2018 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 87 Exhibit to #78 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 38, #31 Exhibit 39, #32 Exhibit 45)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 19, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #78 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 44, #14 Exhibit 46, #15 Exhibit 47, #16 Exhibit 48)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #77 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 19, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Response Brief to PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 45 Pages by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 12, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Union, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
November 12, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Royston, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
November 7, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #81 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 6, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Imerys' Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Certification of Mark K. Silver, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, MARK)
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #80 MOTION to Seal Document #79 Exhibit (to Document),, Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Seal Exhibit D, Submitted in Support of its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #78 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #77 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims. Motions set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 5, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION to Seal Document #79 Exhibit (to Document),, Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Seal Exhibit D, Submitted in Support of its Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 79 Exhibit to #78 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, Exhibit D to Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (TINSLEY, CAROLINE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 5, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A - Petition, #4 Exhibit B - Noland Jr Affidavit, #5 Exhibit C - Noland Sr Affidavit, #6 Exhibit E - Amended Articles of Incorporation, #7 Exhibit F - Request for Termination (dissolution), #8 Exhibit G - Crume Affidavit, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION to Sever Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Sever Claims, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A - Petition, #4 Exhibit B - MOED Doc 39, #5 Exhibit C - Brown v Walgreens, #6 Exhibit D - Amended Writ of Prohibition, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by PTI Union, LLC. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A - Petition, #4 Exhibit B - Crume Affidavit, #5 Exhibit C - Nolan Jr Affidavit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
November 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #71 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages, #75 MOTION to Seal Certain Accompanying Exhibits. Motions set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 1, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION to Seal Certain Accompanying Exhibits by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 74 Exhibit to #73 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15, #12 Exhibit 16, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30, #25 Exhibit 33, #26 Exhibit 34, #27 Exhibit 35, #28 Exhibit 36, #29 Exhibit 37, #30 Exhibit 39, #31 Exhibit 40, #32 Exhibit 44, #33 Exhibit 45, #34 Exhibit 46, #35 Exhibit 47, #36 Exhibit 48, #37 Exhibit 49, #38 Exhibit 50, #39 Exhibit 51, #40 Exhibit 52, #41 Exhibit 53, #42 Exhibit 54)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 1, 2018 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #72 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 17, #6 Exhibit 18, #7 Exhibit 31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 41, #11 Exhibit 42, #12 Exhibit 43, #13 Exhibit 55, #14 Exhibit 56, #15 Exhibit 57, #16 Exhibit 58, #17 Exhibit 59, #18 Exhibit 60, #19 Exhibit 61, #20 Exhibit 62, #21 Exhibit 63, #22 Exhibit 64)(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to Remand to the Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by All Plaintiffs. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of 45 Pages by Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, DANNY DAVIS, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, DONNA HALL, RITA HOSTON, Duncan Hails, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, HELEN JOHNSON, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, DONNA PETERSON, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, GREGORY SPEICHER, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, NANCY WHITE, TRACY WOOD, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Debbie Wynn. (BLAIR, WILLIAM)
October 16, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC (SILVER, MARK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 69 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
October 5, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem)
October 5, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
October 4, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
October 4, 2018 Filing 66 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB)
October 3, 2018 Filing 64 TRANSFER ORDER w/ Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. (DLB)
August 21, 2018 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no additional motions shall be filed in this stayed case by any party absent a lifting of the stay. (KEK)
August 20, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pending Ruling on Remand by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 61 SEALED DOCUMENT re #60 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit C to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Seal Document Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to File Exhibit C to its Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim under Seal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, #2 Exhibit A - Noland, Jr. Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Noland, Sr. Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - to be submitted under seal, #5 Exhibit D - 3-26-2008 Am. Art. of Incorporation (name change), #6 Exhibit E - 12-31-2012 Request for Termination (dissolution), #7 Exhibit F - Crume Affidavit)(Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 57 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 56 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
August 13, 2018 Filing 55 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF STAY: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is stayed pending a decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on plaintiffs motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/30/18. (ARL)
July 27, 2018 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue, #36 MOTION to Dismiss Case PTI Union LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motions to Dismiss Pending Ruling on Remand filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 27, 2018 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
July 27, 2018 Filing 51 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings (KJS)
July 20, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue, #36 MOTION to Dismiss Case PTI Union LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 20, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. On July 12, 2018, the Panel filed in this docket a conditional transfer order (CTO-96) pertaining to this action (Gibson). In the absence of any known opposition to the proposed transfer, the stay of transmittal with regard to Gibson was lifted on July 20, 2018, and the action was transferred to the District of New Jersey. Subsequently, also on July 20, 2018, plaintiffs, through counsel, filed a motion to reinstate the CTO. Counsel states that the notice of opposition was not filed due to clerical error. Appended to plaintiff's motion is a notice of opposition. The Panel is persuaded that these circumstances justify reinstatement of the conditional transfer order in Gibson in order to permit plaintiffs to pursue their opposition to transfer.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panels conditional transfer orderdesignated as CTO-96" filed on July 12, 2018, is REINSTATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's notice of opposition is deemed filed as of the date of this order. Plaintiff's motion to vacate the conditional transfer order, and a separate supporting brief, will be due according to the briefing schedule that will issue shortly. (DLB)
July 20, 2018 Filing 47 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-96) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel on 7/20/18. (KJS)
July 20, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bauer, Beth)
July 20, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bauer, Beth)
July 20, 2018 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bauer, Beth)
July 20, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Bauer, Beth)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #40 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED and #41 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document - Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 7/19/18. (KEK)
July 18, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document - Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 18, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 13, 2018 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #38 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Writ of Prohibition)(Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Sever Claims and Motion to Transfer for Improper Venue by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Case PTI Union LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crume Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Noland Affidavit)(Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Case PTI Union LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 35 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 34 Consent to Removal by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 13, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Hearing re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 26 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT re #22 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Exhibits A-D, F and H To Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Their Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Remand in Excess of the Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Heidi Amiro, Lois Arnstein, Anna Arroyo, William Ayres, Francesca Beniquez, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Dan Breshears, Brent J. Christensen, Tamika Clark, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Raymond P. Coots, Jill Corbin, Walter Croxton, Steven Cynewski, Danny Davis, Lea Deaton, Larry DiBattista, Kathleen Dukes, Donal E. Endsley, Randa Foda, Eva Foster, Amy Frederick, Paula Genovesi, Cynthia Gibson, Jamie Gonzalez, Diane Goodin, Julia Griffith, Duncan Hails, Donna Hall, Susan Haluzak, Michelle Hemmin, Andrea Heredia, Juanita Hill, Dolores Hinojosa, Rita Hoston, Helen Johnson, Robert Kawelaske, Trinity Kelly, Deborah L. Meara, Marcia Mears, Catherine M. Mento, Donna R. Nelson, Donna Peterson, Allen Prescott, Cindy Rasmussen, Tamara Rhoades, Diann Robinson, William Robinson, Mary Ann Rutherford, Deshondra Salami, Alice Salas, Tracie Scheftner, Jodale Skinner, Emmanuel Solidum, Gregory Speicher, Janelle Stevens, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Janine Tollis, David Vanness, Archie Wellman, Brenda Sue White, Nancy White, Tracy Wood, Debbie Wynn. (Blair, William)
July 13, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Joinder Defendants Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
July 13, 2018 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. Parent companies: Imerys Minerals Holding Limited (UK); Imerys USA, Inc.;Imerys S.A., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
July 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mellow, Mary Anne)
July 13, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Anne Mellow for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Mellow, Mary Anne)
July 13, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark A. Prost for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Prost, Mark)
July 13, 2018 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven Thomas Walsh for Defendant Imerys Talc America, Inc.. (Walsh, Steven)
July 6, 2018 Filing 12 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 6, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Rita Hoston, Michelle Hemmin, Tracy Wood, Donal E. Endsley, Dawn D. Blankenchip, Jamie Gonzalez, Lea Deaton, Steven Cynewski, Donna Peterson, Gregory Speicher, Diane Goodin, Pamela Swecker Kinder, Brenda Sue White, Kathleen Dukes, Jodale Skinner, Susan Haluzak, Juanita Hill, Tamika Clark, Diann Robinson, Duncan Hails, Mary Ann Rutherford, Trinity Kelly, Debbie Wynn, Janine Tollis, Marcia Mears, Abigale Clinkenbeard, Walter Croxton, Alice Salas, Archie Wellman, Janelle Stevens, Allen Prescott, Larry DiBattista, Nancy White, Emmanuel Solidum, Heidi Amiro, Danny Davis, Cynthia Gibson, Donna Hall, Paula Genovesi, Julia Griffith, Deborah L. Meara, Jill Corbin, David Vanness, William Robinson, Amy Frederick, Tracie Scheftner, Randa Foda, Catherine M. Mento, Cindy Rasmussen, Eva Foster, Raymond P. Coots, Francesca Beniquez, Dolores Hinojosa, Lois Arnstein, Brent J. Christensen, Deshondra Salami, Tamara Rhoades, Dan Breshears, Robert Kawelaske, Anna Arroyo, Andrea Heredia, Helen Johnson, Donna R. Nelson, William Ayres.(BAK)
July 6, 2018 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment NOR)(Bauer, Beth)
July 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1822-cc06811, with receipt number 0865-6628634, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Mento
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randa Foda
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Arroyo
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna R. Nelson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Rhoades
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diann Robinson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Stevens
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Robinson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan Hails
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Breshears
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Griffith
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Goodin
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshondra Salami
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ayres
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Gonzalez
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodale Skinner
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn D. Blankenchip
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Meara
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kawelaske
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Deaton
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent J. Christensen
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Arnstein
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA HALL
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cynewski
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY WOOD
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Corbin
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY SPEICHER
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA PETERSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Hinojosa
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Swecker Kinder
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Tollis
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN JOHNSON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Haluzak
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA HOSTON
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Mears
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hemmin
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Scheftner
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Croxton
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Heredia
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vanness
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Gibson
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Frederick
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Solidum
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Dukes
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY WHITE
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Rutherford
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donal E. Endsley
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry DiBattista
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Rasmussen
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Amiro
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigale Clinkenbeard
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Wellman
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Wynn
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Genovesi
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Prescott
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Foster
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY DAVIS
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Hill
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond P. Coots
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesca Beniquez
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamika Clark
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Salas
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sue White
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinity Kelly
Represented By: STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS
Represented By: WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC
Represented By: Steven Thomas Walsh
Represented By: MARY ANNE MELLOW
Represented By: MARK A. PROST
Represented By: MARK K. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?