NDU et al v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Plaintiff: BELINDA NDU and OBINNA NDU
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Case Number: 3:2018cv14780
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. (FERDINAND, LANE)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(FERDINAND, LANE)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/16/2018. (mps)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. identifying ARX HOLDING CORP. as Corporate Parent.. (FERDINAND, LANE)
October 10, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jmh)
October 10, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
October 10, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Incorrect vicinage chosen. Case has been copied to Trenton for assignment . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (FERDINAND, LANE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY, case number OCN-L-2191-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9080134), filed by AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP..(FERDINAND, LANE) Modified on 10/10/2018 (jmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NDU et al v. AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STRATEGIC INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: LANE M. FERDINAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA NDU
Represented By: FRANK P. WINSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OBINNA NDU
Represented By: FRANK P. WINSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?