ANDERTON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAMS ANDERTON and MARGIE ANDERTON
Defendant: REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION, REVLON, INC., 3M COMPANY a/k/a MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, MONTELLO, INC, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, CONOPCO, INC., BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, 3M COMPANY, PFIZER INC., CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP, CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY and BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv14949
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 70 Letter from Steven Weiner, Esq. re: Mennen's Request for an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond. (WEINER, STEVEN)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of correspondence from counsel. (ECF No. #64 .) The Court finds good cause to stay and administratively terminate the motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. #6 , #7 , #10 , #48 , #57 , #58 ) pending the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' motion to remand (ECF No. #4 ). By December 14, 2018, each Defendant must e-file correspondence that sets forth its position with respect to Plaintiffs' motion to remand. The Court will enter an appropriate order following its decision on Plaintiffs' motion to remand. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/10/2018. (gxh)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension of time through 12/14/2018 for BSI to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 12/6/2018. (mps)
December 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Steven S. Schulte Receipt number TRE097686 (in-jdb, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 67 Letter from Robert E. Lytle, Esq. re: Stay or Adjournment of UCC Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 48) re #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (LYTLE, ROBERT)
December 4, 2018 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY identifying Freeport Minerals Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. identifying Imerys Minerals Holding Limited as Corporate Parent.. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 64 Letter from Robert Lytle Requesting Stay of Briefing or adjournment to 1.22.19. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 30, 2018 Filing 63 Letter from Albert L. Piccerilli on behalf of Defendant Brenntag Specialties, Inc.. (PICCERILLI, ALBERT)
November 29, 2018 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.. (PICCERILLI, ALBERT)
November 29, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD EDWARD HURST on behalf of BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC. (HURST, RONALD)
November 29, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by ALBERT LOUIS PICCERILLI on behalf of BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC. (PICCERILLI, ALBERT)
November 28, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Jeanette S. Riggins Esq., Receipt Number TRE097474 (in-jdb, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER ORDER adjourning the #6 , #7 , and #10 Motions to Dismiss to 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/27/2018. (mps)
November 27, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #58 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #57 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 26, 2018 Filing 58 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief MOL in Support of Revlon Consumer Products Corporation's MTD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 26, 2018 Filing 57 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REVLON, INC.. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief MOL in Support of Revlon, Inc.'s MTD, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Walter Lynch, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/26/2018. (mps)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Steven S. Schulte, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/26/2018. (mps)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CONSENT ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/26/2018. (mps)
November 26, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #51 , #52 and #53 Motions to Dismiss submitted by Roy Viola on 11/21/2018 did not contain proper electronic signatures (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENTS WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Roy Viola.) The Clerk's Office has terminated the calendar events created by these filings. The #52 and #53 Motions to Dismiss also appear to be duplicates. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
November 21, 2018 Filing 53 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 21, 2018 Filing 52 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REVLON, INC.. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 21, 2018 Filing 51 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by REVLON, INC.. Responses due by 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 21, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #50 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manuel A. Guevara. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 20, 2018 Filing 50 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manuel A. Guevara by REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION, REVLON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. for PHV Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order for PHV Admission of M. Guevara)(VIOLA, ROY)
November 20, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion reset for 1/7/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 19, 2018 Filing 49 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 15, 2018 Filing 48 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. Responses due by 11/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Opperman, #3 Certification Cert of Albano, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the video discovery deposition of Plaintiff William Anderton shall be scheduled to begin the week of 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/14/2018. (mps)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeanette S. Riggins, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/14/2018. (mps)
November 13, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIMS AND, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PFIZER INC..(GARDINER, DONNA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 Letter from Robert E. Lytle resubmitting Proposed Form of Order re #43 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #43 Letter submitted by Robert Lytle on 11/9/2018 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Robert Lytle.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
November 9, 2018 Filing 43 Letter from Robert Lytle, Esq. w/ Proposed Form of Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 9, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #42 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeanette S. Riggins. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 9, 2018 Filing 42 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeanette S. Riggins by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification in support of PHV Admission, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WEINER, STEVEN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 41 Letter from Colgate-Palmolive Company. (WEINER, STEVEN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN ALLEN WEINER on behalf of COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (WEINER, STEVEN)
November 8, 2018 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2018. (if, )
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ernest Foundas, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/8/2018. (mps)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Mark J. Jung, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/8/2018. (mps)
November 8, 2018 Filing 37 Letter from Revlon, Inc.. (VIOLA, ROY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 36 Letter from Union Carbide re: Pro Hac Motion re #33 Letter. (ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (WEDINGER, RICHARD)
November 8, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD W. WEDINGER on behalf of ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (WEDINGER, RICHARD)
November 8, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #32 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ernest Foundas. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 7, 2018 Filing 33 Letter from Robert Lytle, Esq.. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 7, 2018 Filing 32 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ernest Foundas by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Albano, #2 Certification Certification of Foundas, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate Of Service)(ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
November 6, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC..(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by CONOPCO, INC..(ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. identifying Unilever PLC and Unilever NV as Corporate Parent.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONOPCO, INC. identifying Unilever United States, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motions reset for 12/3/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
November 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by NAOMI DELEEUW BARROWCLOUGH on behalf of CONOPCO, INC., UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. (BARROWCLOUGH, NAOMI)
November 5, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by GAVIN J. ROONEY on behalf of CONOPCO, INC., UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. (ROONEY, GAVIN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 25 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 5, 2018 Filing 24 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (LYTLE, ROBERT)
November 5, 2018 Filing 23 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (LYTLE, ROBERT)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIMS AND, CROSSCLAIM against BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY, CONOPCO, INC., CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., MONTELLO, INC, PFIZER INC., PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY, REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION, REVLON, INC., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC. by 3AM COMPANY.(BRUNERMER, CATHERINE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3AM COMPANY. (BRUNERMER, CATHERINE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE E. BRUNERMER on behalf of 3AM COMPANY (BRUNERMER, CATHERINE)
October 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PFIZER INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/15/2018. (mps)
October 30, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PFIZER INC.. (GARDINER, DONNA)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (GARDINER, DONNA)
October 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joseph LaSala on 10/30/2018 was submitted incorrectly using the event Notice (Other). PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Corporate Disclosure Statement found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
October 30, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #14 Application for an Extension filed by Donna Gardiner on 10/30/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
October 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by PFIZER INC. of corporate disclosure (LASALA, JOSEPH)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH P. LASALA on behalf of PFIZER INC. (LASALA, JOSEPH)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by DONNA DUBETH GARDINER on behalf of PFIZER INC. (GARDINER, DONNA)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PFIZER INC.. (GARDINER, DONNA)
October 30, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/15/2018. (mps)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Union Carbide.. (ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.. (PATEL, POOJA)
October 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION identifying Dow as Corporate Parent.. (PICINI, RICHARD)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(KOZAK, CHRISTOPHER)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS ALBANO, III on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (ALBANO, NICHOLAS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (PICINI, RICHARD)
October 23, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
October 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Robert E. Lytle in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT E. LYTLE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LYTLE, ROBERT)
October 15, 2018 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
October 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and ALL defendants as listed on the caption of the original complaint. Several parties have not been added to this docket. Also, there should only be ONE initiating document filed per civil action number, but two were filed here. Please call (609)989-2065 to explain . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-5866-18AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9090815), filed by REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to RCPC's Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet RCPC's Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(VIOLA, ROY) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jmh).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REVLON, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY,, case number MID-L-5866-18AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9090797), filed by REVLON, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Revlon's Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Revlon, Inc.'s Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(VIOLA, ROY) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jmh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERTON et al v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAMS ANDERTON
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGIE ANDERTON
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVLON CONSUMER PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVLON, INC.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY a/k/a MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER S. KOZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONTELLO, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By: RICHARD W. WEDINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONOPCO, INC.
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: NAOMI DELEEUW BARROWCLOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.
Represented By: RONALD EDWARD HURST
Represented By: ALBERT LOUIS PICCERILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: NICHOLAS ALBANO, III
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: CATHERINE E. BRUNERMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN CHRISTIE MCMEEKIN, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC.
Represented By: GAVIN J. ROONEY
Represented By: NAOMI DELEEUW BARROWCLOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?