LIN et al v. HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK et al
Plaintiff: JAY LIN and IRENE LIN
Defendant: HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, PARKER MCCAY PA and M&T BANK
Lead Plaintiff: Esq. Jay Lin
Case Number: 3:2018cv15387
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
December 10, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion reset for 1/22/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default against Defendant Parker Mccay. (LIN, JAY)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Set Aside Default by PARKER MCCAY PA. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Declaration of Counsel in Support, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Proposed Order)(SAYLES, ANDREW)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER in the absence of Plaintiff's consent to vacate the default entered against Defendant Parker McKay, Defendant must file a motion to vacate the default. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/30/18. (if, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Defendant Parker McCay to Judge Goodman regarding extension of time and entry of default. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Exchange with Plaintiff)(SAYLES, ANDREW)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW CHRISTOPHER SAYLES on behalf of PARKER MCCAY PA (SAYLES, ANDREW)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Default by Jay Lin against Parker McCay, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support to enter default, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LIN, JAY)
November 29, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #11 Request for Default filed by Jay Lin on 11/28/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING the event Request for Default found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mps)
November 29, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PARKER MCCAY PA for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mps)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Parker Mccay for failure to answer or plead by Jay Lin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support to enter default)(LIN, JAY)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Lin. PARKER MCCAY PA served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (LIN, JAY)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Lin. PARKER MCCAY PA served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (LIN, JAY)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendants may serve their response to the Complaint is extended to 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/26/2018. (mps)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARISSA EDWARDS on behalf of HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK (EDWARDS, MARISSA)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT W. PARKER on behalf of HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK (PARKER, SCOTT)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED W. HOENSCH on behalf of HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK (HOENSCH, FRED)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Hudson City Bank and M&T Bank, by consent.. (BERG, JAMES)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES PAUL BERG on behalf of HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK (BERG, JAMES)
November 21, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by M&T BANK, HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK has been DENIED. This request is beyond the scope of what the Clerk can grant and has been forwarded to chambers. (mps)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK, PARKER MCCAY PA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, M&T BANK, PARKER MCCAY PA. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9129735) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JAY LIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIN, JAY)
October 29, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIN et al v. HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY LIN
Represented By: JAY J. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE LIN
Represented By: JAY J. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: SCOTT W. PARKER
Represented By: JAMES PAUL BERG
Represented By: FRED W. HOENSCH
Represented By: MARISSA EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER MCCAY PA
Represented By: ANDREW CHRISTOPHER SAYLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T BANK
Represented By: SCOTT W. PARKER
Represented By: JAMES PAUL BERG
Represented By: FRED W. HOENSCH
Represented By: MARISSA EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Esq. Jay Lin
Represented By: JAY J. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?