FOODNATION INC. et al v. YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: FOODNATION, INC., G AND P WAREHOUSE INTERNATIONAL LLC t/a FOODNATION PRODUCE DISTRIBUTORS and G AND P WAREHOUSE INTERNATIONAL LLC
Defendant: YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC and ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA
Case Number: 3:2018cv15465
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from David W. Fassett, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Order)(FASSETT, DAVID)
December 6, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC and ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mmh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Yana Enterprises, LLC and Angelo Costagliola. (FASSETT, DAVID)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs CONFIRMING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA (FASSETT, DAVID)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs CONFIRMING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC (FASSETT, DAVID)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Theresa L. Burnett, Chief Deputy on 11/5/18. (lm2, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Application for Refund of Fees from Arseneault & Fassett, LLP (finance notified).. (FASSETT, DAVID)
November 1, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Application for A Refund of Fees filed by David Fassett on 10/31/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application USING Application for Refund of Fees found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Arseneault & Fassett, LLP. (FASSETT, DAVID)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA, YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
October 31, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G AND P WAREHOUSE INTERNATIONAL LLC t/a FOODNATION PRODUCE DISTRIBUTORS, YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC, ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9135239), filed by FOODNATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons Yana Enterprises, LLC, #4 Summons Angelo Costagliola)(FASSETT, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOODNATION INC. et al v. YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANA ENTERPRISES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELO COSTAGLIOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOODNATION, INC.
Represented By: DAVID W. FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G AND P WAREHOUSE INTERNATIONAL LLC t/a FOODNATION PRODUCE DISTRIBUTORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G AND P WAREHOUSE INTERNATIONAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?