NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION v. GREWAL
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Case Number: 3:2018cv15725
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: In-Person Status Conference held on 1/3/2019. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN MARIE SCOTT on behalf of GURBIR GREWAL (SCOTT, SUSAN)
January 3, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID S. BLATT, RACHEL RODMAN and BENJAMIN E. MOSKOWITZ, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mmh)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Benjamin E. Moskowitz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9275351.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Rachel Rodman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9275304.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David S. Blatt to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9275273.) (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to David S. Blatt, Rachell Rodman, and Benjamin E. Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/21/2018. (km)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Defendan Gurbir Grewal. (COHEN, GEORGE)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Lawrence S. Lustberg re Set/Reset Hearings. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER that the time for Defendant to answer is extended to 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/19/2018. (mmh)
December 19, 2018 Notice of Hearing: In-Person Status Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti; counsel only. Please confirm receipt of court notice by letter (e-file) not later than 12/20/2018. (DS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM BLAKE MASEF on behalf of GURBIR GREWAL (MASEF, ADAM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, GEORGE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE N. COHEN on behalf of All Defendants (COHEN, GEORGE)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney GEORGE N. COHEN for GURBIR GREWAL added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, GEORGE)
December 3, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GURBIR GREWAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2018. (mmh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION. GURBIR GREWAL served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. HAGGERTY on behalf of NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION (HAGGERTY, JOHN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR GREWAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR GREWAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9152317), filed by NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 L. Civ. R. 10.1(a) Statement, #3 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification)(LUSTBERG, LAWRENCE)
November 6, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION v. GREWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG
Represented By: JOHN D. HAGGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Represented By: ADAM BLAKE MASEF
Represented By: SUSAN MARIE SCOTT
Represented By: GEORGE N. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?