BREITNER et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: DOROTHY WHITTEN, DENNIS BROXTERMAN, LINDA COREY, RUTH COOLEEN, DOUGLAS JOHNSTON, ALVIN BREITNER, COLETTE CHOUINARD, HOWARD HILL, JOAN BOYLE, JOAN BARGE, JOYCE JOZWIAK, PATRICIA CARLSON, CORNELIA MARATHON, FLOSSIE FLETT, PAUL GAFFNEY, ELIZABETH DISCIASCIO, CECILIA ESPINOZA, DOROTHY DYER, BEVERLY MARBLE, JUDITH TONNEMACHER, THOMAS BOBBERT, DAWN HOFFMAN, JOHN FONDA, MARCUS HIGGINS, PATRICIA JARDINE, WILLIAM FELTON, TWILA ADDISON, KELLY BYRNES, JANET BEKTASHI, EARL LISTUL, DELBERT BLANKENSHIP, JUAN RUIZ, PEARL KEINGARSKY, WILLIAM CORNELIUS, DERNA TRAMMELL, ANDRE DUPREE, ALICE HYNEK, EULALIE SHORT, TAVIA WHITEHEAD, CHARLENE CARDINAL, WILLA WILKINSON, FRIDAY HAMLET, DENNIS WALSH, JEANNEEN TERRY, KATHLEEN GUILD, JOHNNIE DAVIS, SAM M. HANSON, JOHN STEFANO, MARY THOMPSON, JENNIE ARELLANES, DIANE OFNER, RENO CRUMRIN, CAROLYN PORTER, LINDA PATTON, BILLY TALIAFERRO, NANCY COOK-KRAUSE, LINDA JAMES, VIRGINIA HAUFF, JANET JACKSON, MARGARET VINCENT, WILMA BATTEN, GWYNNE LAMBERT, DAVID BARBER, FRANCES SAUCIER, ERNESTINE NATOLI, LUTIE FISCHER, TONI ALBANO, MARTHA KIRKPATRICK, JANIE MCFARLIN, CONSTANCE A. DIONISIO, MARGO TRAVIS, GIOVANNI MESSINA, JOHN GLORIOSO, SANDRA LEREW, FRANK STEWART, WILLIE CLINTON, MARY KEELER, HELEN BREITNER, FAITH COWART, JOSEPH FLEMMING, IMNACULATA ACKERLY, OWEN MYRICK and JOHN MORRIS
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC., MCKESSON CORP. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Case Number: 3:2018cv15982
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOYCE, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (JOYCE, THOMAS)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION re Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims to Extend Time to File Opposition or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims by All Plaintiffs. (CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which McKesson, may answer, move, or otherwise reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended 30 days following the Court's entry of an Order deciding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/18/2018. (km)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order to Extrend Time to Respond to Complaint by MCKESSON CORP.. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Merck & Co., Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. regarding briefing schedule re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling. (HOLLOWS, ALLISON)
December 10, 2018 Set Deadlines as to the #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 6, 2018 Set Deadlines for the #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy with Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN A. CONFOY on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (CONFOY, KAREN)
December 4, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MCKESSON CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2018. (km)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to McKesson Corp.. Attorney LISA CARNEY ELDRIDGE for MCKESSON CORP. added. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
December 4, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for the Clerk's Extension of Time, d.e. #3 filed by Lisa Eldridge on 12/3/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a Application/Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Request for the Clerk's Extension USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by MCKESSON CORP.. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
November 9, 2018 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (HOLLOWS, ALLISON)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., MERCK & CO., INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID L 4031 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9161039), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Certificate of Service)(HOLLOWS, ALLISON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BREITNER et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY WHITTEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BROXTERMAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA COREY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH COOLEEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS JOHNSTON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVIN BREITNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLETTE CHOUINARD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD HILL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN BOYLE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN BARGE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE JOZWIAK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA CARLSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORNELIA MARATHON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLOSSIE FLETT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL GAFFNEY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH DISCIASCIO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA ESPINOZA
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOROTHY DYER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY MARBLE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH TONNEMACHER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS BOBBERT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN HOFFMAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FONDA
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS HIGGINS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA JARDINE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FELTON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWILA ADDISON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY BYRNES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET BEKTASHI
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL LISTUL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELBERT BLANKENSHIP
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN RUIZ
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARL KEINGARSKY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CORNELIUS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERNA TRAMMELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE DUPREE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICE HYNEK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EULALIE SHORT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAVIA WHITEHEAD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE CARDINAL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLA WILKINSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIDAY HAMLET
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS WALSH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNEEN TERRY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN GUILD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE DAVIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM M. HANSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN STEFANO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY THOMPSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIE ARELLANES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE OFNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENO CRUMRIN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN PORTER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA PATTON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY TALIAFERRO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY COOK-KRAUSE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA JAMES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA HAUFF
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET JACKSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET VINCENT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILMA BATTEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWYNNE LAMBERT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BARBER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES SAUCIER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTINE NATOLI
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTIE FISCHER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONI ALBANO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA KIRKPATRICK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANIE MCFARLIN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSTANCE A. DIONISIO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGO TRAVIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIOVANNI MESSINA
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GLORIOSO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA LEREW
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK STEWART
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE CLINTON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY KEELER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN BREITNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAITH COWART
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH FLEMMING
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMNACULATA ACKERLY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN MYRICK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MORRIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORP.
Represented By: LISA CARNEY ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?