SHERMAN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMMA DULESKY, BERTHA KIRSCH, CLARENCE DICKEN, MARILYN FERGUSON, DEBORAH LUSK, DONNA CONNER, LINDA BOYLE, SHARON RASNAKE, KENNETH WILCOX, JOHN R. FIGGS, NANCY ROGAUKAS, SHERYL GARDNER, JEANNE JACKSON, JEROLINE FOSTER, ANN YIAMBELLIS, DOUGLAS GEORGE, SUE WISCHMEYER, LINDA JEFFERSON, TERRY MALOVICH, JUDY HAUK, CAROLYN WACIN, AUDREY HANCOCK, DIANE BULLOCK, SARAH ERKINS, ETHELYN ANDERSON, JOHN BEST, BEVERLEESHIA DAVIS, ARCANGELO DIFRONZO, SUSAN PONTI, LUTHER BARGER, THOMAS ZENTACK, JAMES ELLIS, STEVEN TURBYFILL, SHARON BURDETTE, ROBBIE L. BROUSSARD, EVELYN MCALL, ENGE LEBLANC, GARY HANNA, ALL BLOSE, WILLIAM LOUCHERY JR., WANDA ROSALES, JEROME MADAY, REGINA BIBBS, SEIGLE BAISDEN, LYNDA WATSON, MARY HARRELL, JANICE BAKER, EMMA INGOLD, JOAN JOHNSON, RAMONA MANSKER, LEON HOWARD, RITA SMITH, MICHAEL DERRICO, LINDA RAMIREZ, JANICE HOWELL SPILLERS, LINDA HARRIS, GLORIA ALIS, EDWARD QUAGLIATA, WILLARD RALPH DYESS, FRANK SPENCER, JACKIE FEIST, KAREN ESTEP, KATHY BLANKENSHIP, JACQUELINE MICHELLE MCRIGHT, REECIE CARTER, CAROL SALZILLO, CRAIG BURRELL, LULA LOWE, JUDY NEWELL, DEREK SMTH, JOAN AKINS, MAVIS PATTERSON, JOANNE VICKERS, ROGER ADAMS, PEGGY WILSON, RUSSELL ALBAUGH, GLORIA SHY, MINERVA FRYE, CAROLYN MAUCH, VICKIE SMITH, ELAINE DITTMAN, DESSIE MCCLURE, ELIJAH COOPER, TAMERA JOHNSON, CHARLES DURHAM, CINDY BOX, BETTY HELTON, ADA BLACKWELL, FRANCES GAMMILL, CHARLES A. BOYER, JOSEPH BANDOCK, BARBARA VIGLIENVONE, MARIAN WRIGHT, NORA ARD, CAROL YOUNG, KATY SAVELL, Frances Davis, JOEL MOSKOWITZ, CONRAD HUFFMAN, INGRID GERLACH, TERESA BARBER, BOBBY CARR, CLIFTON RUCKER, LAWRENCE COATES, BAMBI FINLEY, JOHN SMALLEY, ROBERT SULLIVAN, DAVID MIZAK, KENNETH W. JACOBSON, MCKINLEY LEE, BETTY GALLAGHER, DOLORES TAYLOR, LENORA WAGNER, LEONARD SHERMAN, JOHN HATZENBUHLER, LOUISE MCCOWEN, MARY DOUGLAS, NONA GODWIN, JAMES MICHAEL CALT, RUTH TUCKER, RHODA NEFT, CAROL MOODY, IVA MACLEES, NORBERT DORAN, EUGENE JUREK, CAROL HENDRICK, HAROLD LEWIS, TIM GARTLAND, BARBARA HESSION, GLORIA SCHULTZ, GENE GASSITTIE, GLORIA NORBY and LOUISE GUIE
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC., MCKESSON CORP. and MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Case Number: 3:2018cv15985
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS J. JOYCE, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (JOYCE, THOMAS)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, to Extend Time to File Opposition or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims by All Plaintiffs. (CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which McKesson may respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended until 30 days following the Court's entry of an Order deciding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 12/18/2018. (mmh)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, #1 Notice of Removal,, to Extrend Time to Respond to Complaint by MCKESSON CORP.. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Merck & Co., Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. regarding briefing schedule re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling. (HOLLOWS, ALLISON)
December 10, 2018 Set deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Expedite Briefing to Reduce Defendants Time to File a Response and Expedite Ruling by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CORDNER, MARGARET)
December 6, 2018 Set deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 6, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MCKESSON CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/18/2018. (mmh)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Misrepresentation Claims by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Karen A. Confoy with Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CONFOY, KAREN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN A. CONFOY on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (CONFOY, KAREN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to McKesson Corp.. Attorney LISA CARNEY ELDRIDGE for MCKESSON CORP. added. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Application for a Clerk's Extension filed by Lisa Eldridge on 12/3/2018 was submitted incorrectly as an Application/Petition. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application for a Clerk's Extension USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order found under Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by MCKESSON CORP.. (ELDRIDGE, LISA)
November 9, 2018 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jem)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (HOLLOWS, ALLISON)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., MERCK & CO., INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID L 4905 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9161072), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP., MERCK & CO., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 L. Civ. R. 11.2 Certification, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Certificate of Service)(HOLLOWS, ALLISON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERMAN et al v. MERCK & CO., INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA DULESKY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERTHA KIRSCH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARENCE DICKEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN FERGUSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH LUSK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA CONNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA BOYLE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON RASNAKE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH WILCOX
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN R. FIGGS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY ROGAUKAS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERYL GARDNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNE JACKSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROLINE FOSTER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN YIAMBELLIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS GEORGE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUE WISCHMEYER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA JEFFERSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY MALOVICH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY HAUK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN WACIN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY HANCOCK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE BULLOCK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH ERKINS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHELYN ANDERSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BEST
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLEESHIA DAVIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARCANGELO DIFRONZO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN PONTI
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUTHER BARGER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ZENTACK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ELLIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN TURBYFILL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON BURDETTE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBBIE L. BROUSSARD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN MCALL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENGE LEBLANC
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY HANNA
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL BLOSE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LOUCHERY JR.
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA ROSALES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME MADAY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA BIBBS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIGLE BAISDEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA WATSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HARRELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE BAKER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMA INGOLD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN JOHNSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA MANSKER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON HOWARD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITA SMITH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DERRICO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA RAMIREZ
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE HOWELL SPILLERS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA HARRIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA ALIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD QUAGLIATA
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLARD RALPH DYESS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK SPENCER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE FEIST
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN ESTEP
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BLANKENSHIP
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE MICHELLE MCRIGHT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REECIE CARTER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL SALZILLO
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG BURRELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LULA LOWE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY NEWELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK SMTH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN AKINS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAVIS PATTERSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE VICKERS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER ADAMS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY WILSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL ALBAUGH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA SHY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINERVA FRYE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN MAUCH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKIE SMITH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELAINE DITTMAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESSIE MCCLURE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH COOPER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMERA JOHNSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES DURHAM
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY BOX
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY HELTON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADA BLACKWELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES GAMMILL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. BOYER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BANDOCK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA VIGLIENVONE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIAN WRIGHT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORA ARD
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL YOUNG
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATY SAVELL
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Davis
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL MOSKOWITZ
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONRAD HUFFMAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGRID GERLACH
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA BARBER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY CARR
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFTON RUCKER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE COATES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAMBI FINLEY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SMALLEY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SULLIVAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MIZAK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH W. JACOBSON
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKINLEY LEE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY GALLAGHER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLORES TAYLOR
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENORA WAGNER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD SHERMAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN HATZENBUHLER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISE MCCOWEN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY DOUGLAS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NONA GODWIN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MICHAEL CALT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH TUCKER
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHODA NEFT
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL MOODY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVA MACLEES
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORBERT DORAN
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE JUREK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL HENDRICK
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD LEWIS
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM GARTLAND
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA HESSION
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA SCHULTZ
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENE GASSITTIE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA NORBY
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUISE GUIE
Represented By: MARGARET ELIZABETH CORDNER
Represented By: THOMAS J. JOYCE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORP.
Represented By: LISA CARNEY ELDRIDGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: ALLISON LINDA HOLLOWS
Represented By: KAREN A. CONFOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?