UNITED STATES v. WEINER et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Defendant: MARGERY WEINER, STEVEN WEINER, HMFCG INC, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, HULSE & WYNTER LLC, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK and LOANCARE SERVICING CENTER
Case Number: 3:2018cv16034
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HMFCG INC, HULSE & WYNTER LLC, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, LOANCARE SERVICING CENTER, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mmh)
December 26, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The requests for issuance of summons filed by Olga Tobin on 12/21/2018 were submitted incorrectly as proposed summonses attached to the Amended Complaint. Please be advised, for future reference, that a request for the issuance of summons should be filed in letter form using the event Summons Request for Issue found under Civil - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARGERY WEINER, STEVEN WEINER, WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, LOANCARE SERVICING CENTER, JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, HULSE & WYNTER LLC, HMFCG INC, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(TOBIN, OLGA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES. MARGERY WEINER served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (TOBIN, OLGA)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES. STEVEN WEINER served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (TOBIN, OLGA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARGERY WEINER, STEVEN WEINER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Olga Tobin on 11/13/2018 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's counsel Olga Tobin that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
November 13, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARGERY WEINER, STEVEN WEINER, filed by UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(TOBIN, OLGA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES v. WEINER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGERY WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMFCG INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HULSE & WYNTER LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANCARE SERVICING CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: OLGA L. TOBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?