KNJ TRADING, INC v. 130 FARMERS MARKET et al
Plaintiff: KNJ TRADING, INC
Defendant: EAST WINDSOR FARM INC, FIG TREE MARKET, 130 FARMERS MARKET, DAVID OH and CHEON O GUEN
Undetermined: JUDGE HARRY G. CARROLL
Case Number: 3:2018cv16161
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEDIATION ORDER. JUDGE HARRY G. CARROLL (ret.) appointed. Pending further Order of the Court, in order to facilitate the parties mediation efforts, all proceedings in this action are STAYED. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/7/2018. (mmh)
December 7, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE: Order to show cause hearing set for 12/11/2018 has been adjourned pending mediation disposition. (DS)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Case stayed pending mediation. Further ordered all orders to remain in full force and effect. If case not resolved through mediation then parties must notify the court in writing. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/7/2018. (DS)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court hereby appoints Judge Harry G. Carroll (ret.) as mediator. The parties are directed to contact Judge Carroll within 48 hours. Formal order to follow. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/7/18. (Fiore, J)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Jae H. Cho, Mediation. (CHO, JAE)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 Letter re 11 Telephone Conference,. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2018. Parties directed to meet and confer as to the resolution of the case. Further directed parties to report case status not later than 12/7/2018. (Court Reporter: Not on the record.) (DS)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Letter re 8 Order,, Set Hearings, #9 Letter. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Defendant- confirming conference. (CHO, JAE)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re #7 Letter request by defendants to adjourn tomorrow's Order to Show Cause Hearing is Granted. OTSC Hearing rescheduled for 12/11/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Further ordered Telephone Conference for 12/4/2018 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff to initial call then contact chambers with all parties present. Please confirm receipt of court notice by letter (e-file) not later than 12/3/208 by 5:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/3/2018. (DS)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Jae H. Cho, Adjounrment Request. (CHO, JAE)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause served on David Oh on 11/30/2018, filed by KNJ TRADING, INC. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE with TEMPORARY RESTRAINTS and without notice. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Show Cause Response due 12/2/2018 by 3:00PM. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/29/2018. (km)
November 29, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration, d.e. #4 filed by Melissa Hoffman on 11/29/2018 appears to be missing pages. PLEASE RESUBMIT the full Declaration of Byng Kang. This message will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (km)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Byng Soo Kang corrected signature page by KNJ TRADING, INC. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by KNJ TRADING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Certification Attorney Certification, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 130 FARMERS MARKET, EAST WINDSOR FARM INC, FIG TREE MARKET, CHEON O GUEN, DAVID OH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Melissa Hoffman on 11/14/2018 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney Melissa Hoffman that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
November 15, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
November 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 130 FARMERS MARKET, EAST WINDSOR FARM INC, FIG TREE MARKET, CHEON O GUEN, DAVID OH.( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9172932), filed by KNJ TRADING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Index EXHIBIT C)(HOFFMAN, MELISSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNJ TRADING, INC v. 130 FARMERS MARKET et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KNJ TRADING, INC
Represented By: MELISSA YVETTE HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST WINDSOR FARM INC
Represented By: JAE H CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIG TREE MARKET
Represented By: JAE H CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 130 FARMERS MARKET
Represented By: JAE H CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID OH
Represented By: JAE H CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEON O GUEN
Represented By: JAE H CHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: JUDGE HARRY G. CARROLL
Represented By: HARRY G. CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?