STEINBERG et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al

Plaintiff: MICHAELA BANCK, GAMAL EL-ZOGHBY, MICHELE PIERRO, RICARDO VALDES, MARTHA STEINBERG, PIERRO MICHAEL, NEW JERSEY CONSERVATION FOUNDATION, ENVIRONMENT NEW JERSEY, MICHAEL KNIGHT, ANDREAS BEUTLER and DAVID FOX
Defendant: OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 3:2018cv16244
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Douglas E Arpert
1 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 Certification of Service by David M. Kahler on behalf of NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES Re #7 Motion to Dismiss,. (KAHLER, DAVID)
December 19, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification by David M. Kahler, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(KAHLER, DAVID)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (POTTER, R.)
December 12, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/28/2018. (mmh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to New Jersey Department of Transportation and Office of Maritime Resources. Attorney DAVID MICHAEL KAHLER for NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,DAVID MICHAEL KAHLER for OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES added. (KAHLER, DAVID)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARTHA STEINBERG identifying New Jersey Conservation Foundation as Corporate Parent.. (POTTER, R.)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARTHA STEINBERG identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (POTTER, R.)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
November 19, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9178814), filed by MARTHA STEINBERG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USACE Permit, #2 Exhibit letter exhibit)(POTTER, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEINBERG et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAELA BANCK
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAMAL EL-ZOGHBY
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE PIERRO
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO VALDES
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA STEINBERG
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERRO MICHAEL
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY CONSERVATION FOUNDATION
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENT NEW JERSEY
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KNIGHT
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREAS BEUTLER
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID FOX
Represented By: R. WILLIAM POTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF MARITIME RESOURCES
Represented By: DAVID MICHAEL KAHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: DAVID MICHAEL KAHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?