BELLAFIORE v. PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC. et al
Plaintiff: MELISSA BELLAFIORE
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPS 1-10 and PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv16353
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - The initial rule 16 conference set for January 29, 2019, is hereby RESCHEDULED to January 31, 2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The joint discovery plan, as well as any disputes regarding it, be submitted to the undersigned no later than three weeks prior to the above conference (see L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)); the joint discovery plan should NOT be electronically filed, but may be submitted to Chambers via regular mail, facsimile [(609) 989-0435], or e-mail [tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov] Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
December 2, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC..(BOYLE, ELLEN)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/21/2018. (kas)
November 21, 2018 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC. from Superior Court Ocean County, case number OCN-L-2566-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9187820), filed by PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(BOYLE, ELLEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELLAFIORE v. PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETS FIRST OF N.J. INC.
Represented By: ELLEN MIKASKI BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA BELLAFIORE
Represented By: JOHN P. BRENNAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?