IEROKOMOS v.SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. et al
Plaintiff: NANCY IEROKOMOS
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, SANDOZ, INC., ACTAVIS LLC, HOSPIRA, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC., ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, PFIZER, INC. and HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv16420
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Louisiana as case 2:18-cv-14249, filed 01/15/2019. (dm )
January 4, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the LAED. (dm )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-47) transferring case to the USDC for the LAED. (dm )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER Dismissing SANDOZ, INC., SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, ACTAVIS LLC and ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 1/2/2019. (km)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Order. (GROSSMAN, MARC)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER ORDER that by 12/20/2018 Plaintiff is to advise the Court of which two options she believes to be appropriate. Defendants Response due 12/28/2018. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/14/2018. (km)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order. (GROSSMAN, MARC)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC DAVID GROSSMAN on behalf of NANCY IEROKOMOS (GROSSMAN, MARC)
November 28, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/17/2018. (jem)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc... (KABBASH, MAHA)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER that the Plaintiff is directed to respond to the arguments made in Defendant Accord Healthcare, Inc.'s Notice of Removal (ECF No. #1 ) by 12/04/2018. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/27/2018. (jem)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
November 26, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
November 26, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Parties should be entered as captioned on the original state court complaint. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (KABBASH, MAHA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. identifying INTAS PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED as Corporate Parent.. (KABBASH, MAHA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, NJ, case number MID-L-7615-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9192350), filed by ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KABBASH, MAHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IEROKOMOS v.SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI U.S. SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCORD HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPIRA WORLDWIDE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY IEROKOMOS
Represented By: ESTHER EVA BEREZOFSKY
Represented By: MARC DAVID GROSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?