PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE INCOME FUND, LP et al v. RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P. et al
Appellee: MATTHEW CANTOR, RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P., RANGER ALTERNATIVE MANAGEMENT, II, L.P., RANGER DIRECT LENDING FUND TRUST, MICROBILT CORPORATION, DEAN C. WALDT and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Appellant: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC
In Re: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE INCOME FUND, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv16704
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 USCA Case Number 19-3868 for #23 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by MICROBILT CORPORATION. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (39 in 3:18-cv-16557-BRM) Order of Dismissal by MICROBILT CORPORATION. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-10172989. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (BAKER, DEREK)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The Docket in No. 18-16557 shall be the only docket maintained and all filings in any of the foregoing closed cases shall be filed only in case No. 18-16557. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 2/15/2019. (mps)
February 13, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian R. Martinotti: Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2019. Ordered case to be consolidated with related cases: 18-16478 & 18-16557 and the lead docket will be 18-16557. Further ordered counsel for Microbilt Corp., to submit an appropriate consolidation and scheduling order no later than 2/15/2019. (Court Reporter: Megan McKay-Soule.) (DS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by MICROBILT CORPORATION, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC, PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE INCOME FUND, LP, RANGER ALTERNATIVE MANAGEMENT, II, L.P., RANGER DIRECT LENDING FUND TRUST, RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P., UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (BAKER, DEREK)
February 4, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Robert J. Schneider, Jr. (SCHNEIDER, ROBERT)
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Arthur J. Abramowitz re Status Conference re Set/Reset Hearings,. (ABRAMOWITZ, ARTHUR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Derek J. Baker re: Status Conference on February 13, 2019. (BAKER, DEREK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Paul R. DeFilippo re Set/Reset Hearings,. (DEFILIPPO, PAUL)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Dean Waldt Confirming Receipt of Court Notice. (WALDT, DEAN)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 Letter re #13 Notice (Other). (ABRAMOWITZ, ARTHUR)
February 1, 2019 Notice of Hearing: Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Three days prior to the conference the parties are directed to meet and confer, file joint status report "not more than 5 pages" setting forth the nature of case and status of their litigation. Please confirm receipt of court notice by letter (e-file) not later than 2/4/2019.(DS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 JUDICIAL NOTICE re #12 Letter. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (mmh)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Arthur J. Abramowitz re Briefing Schedule. (ABRAMOWITZ, ARTHUR)
January 7, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case management conference set for 1/16/2019 has been ADJOURNED without date.(DS)
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by UNITED STATES TRUSTEE of Entry of Standing Order 18-4 Staying Civil Matters Involving the United States as a Party (SCHNEIDER, ROBERT)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. SCHNEIDER, JR on behalf of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE (SCHNEIDER, ROBERT)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by RANGER ALTERNATIVE MANAGEMENT, II, L.P., RANGER DIRECT LENDING FUND TRUST, RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P., DEAN C. WALDT re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(mmh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(mmh)
December 26, 2018 Set Hearings: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 4/15/2019 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (mmh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Arthur J. Abramowitz re Briefing Schedule. (ABRAMOWITZ, ARTHUR)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from James N. Lawlor re Set/Reset Hearings,. (LAWLOR, JAMES)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES N. LAWLOR on behalf of MATTHEW CANTOR (LAWLOR, JAMES)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Dean Waldt re Set/Reset Hearings. (WALDT, DEAN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Letter from Derek J. Baker (Microbilt Corporation) re Set/Reset Hearings,. (BAKER, DEREK)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Letter re Set/Reset Hearings,. (LUCKMAN, BRUCE)
December 4, 2018 Notice of Hearing: In-Person Status Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Three days prior to the conference the parties are directed to meet and confer, file joint status report "not more than 5 pages" setting forth the nature of case and status of their litigation. Please confirm receipt of court notice by letter (e-file) not later than 12/6/2018. (DS)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-14603, filed by PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Order Being Appealed, #3 Transmittal, #4 Certificate of Service)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE INCOME FUND, LP et al v. RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MATTHEW CANTOR
Represented By: PAUL R. DEFILIPPO
Represented By: JAMES N. LAWLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RANGER SPECIALITY INCOME FUND, L.P.
Represented By: DEAN C. WALDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RANGER ALTERNATIVE MANAGEMENT, II, L.P.
Represented By: DEAN C. WALDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RANGER DIRECT LENDING FUND TRUST
Represented By: DEAN C. WALDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICROBILT CORPORATION
Represented By: DEREK J. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEAN C. WALDT
Represented By: DEAN C. WALDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: ROBERT J. SCHNEIDER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE FUNDING, LLC
Represented By: BRUCE S. LUCKMAN
Represented By: ARTHUR JOEL ABRAMOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PRINCETON ALTERNATIVE INCOME FUND, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?