SLOMOVITZ et al v. THE ENCLAVE AT FAIRWAYS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Plaintiff: MORRIS WALDMAN, NATHAN FRANKEL, SAMUEL LANDY, ABRAHAM TAUBER, DAVID REICH, DAVID SLOMOVITZ, HARRY LIEBER, MIRIAM LEVITZ, EDWARD HANDLER and RABBI DAVID SLOMOVITZ
Defendant: THE ENCLAVE AT FAIRWAYS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Case Number: 3:2018cv16910
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah Elizabeth Child to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RATH, SIEGLINDE)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Blair Lazarus Storzer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RATH, SIEGLINDE)
January 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BLAIR LAZARUS STORZER and SARAH ELIZABETH CHILD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
January 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Sarah Elizabeth Child, Esq. Receipt number TRE099161 (in-jdb)
January 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Blair Lazarus Storzer, Esq. Receipt number TRE099162 (in-jdb)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah E. Child, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/17/2019. (jem)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Blair Lazarus Storzer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/17/2019. (jem)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Blair Lazarus Storzer re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blair Lazarus Storzer by All Plaintiffs. (RATH, SIEGLINDE)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Sarah E. Child re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Elizabeth Child by All Plaintiffs. (RATH, SIEGLINDE)
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Elizabeth Child, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blair Lazarus Storzer. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
December 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declarations of Blair Lazarus and Sarah E. Child submitted by Sieglinde Rath, Esq. on 12/12/2018 did not contain a hand signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DECLARATIONS ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Settlement Conference held on 12/12/2018. Case settled, order to be submitted. (Court Reporter/Recorder Vincent Russoniello.) (jmm, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Elizabeth Child by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah E. Child, #2 Proposed Order)(RATH, SIEGLINDE)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blair Lazarus Storzer by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Blair Lazarus Storzer, #2 Proposed Order)(RATH, SIEGLINDE)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Freda L. Wolfson for all further proceedings. Judge Anne E. Thompson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/07/18. (mem, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SIEGLINDE K. RATH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (RATH, SIEGLINDE)
December 7, 2018 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
December 7, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Christopher Costa on 12/06/2018 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney Christopher Costa that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Morris Waldman, #3 Declaration of Nathan Frankel, #4 Declaration of Edward Handler, #5 Declaration of Miriam Levitz, #6 Declaration of Harry Lieber, #7 Declaration of Menachem Slomovitz, #8 Declaration of Abraham Tauber, #9 Declaration of Rabbi David Slomovitz, #10 Declaration of Samuel Landy, #11 Exhibit A (Landy), #12 Declaration of David Reich, #13 Exhibit A (Reich), #14 Declaration of Nathan Reiss, #15 Exhibit A (Reiss), #16 Exhibit B (Reiss), #17 Exhibit C (Reiss), #18 Exhibit D (Reiss), #19 Exhibit E (Reiss), #20 Exhibit F (Reiss), #21 Text of Proposed Order, #22 Certification of Notice)(COSTA, CHRISTOPHER)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE ENCLAVE AT FAIRWAYS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9221210), filed by HARRY LIEBER, EDWARD HANDLER, DAVID REICH, MORRIS WALDMAN, NATHAN FRANKEL, ABRAHAM TAUBER, SAMUEL LANDY, DAVID SLOMOVITZ, MIRIAM LEVITZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(COSTA, CHRISTOPHER)
December 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLOMOVITZ et al v. THE ENCLAVE AT FAIRWAYS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MORRIS WALDMAN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN FRANKEL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL LANDY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABRAHAM TAUBER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID REICH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SLOMOVITZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY LIEBER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM LEVITZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD HANDLER
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RABBI DAVID SLOMOVITZ
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER K. COSTA
Represented By: SIEGLINDE K. RATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ENCLAVE AT FAIRWAYS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?