EAGLE SYSTEM, INC. v. MOD-PAC CORP. et al
Plaintiff: EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitiously named), MOD-PAC CORP., ABC CORPS 1-10 (fictitious entities), JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv17062
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of Mike King, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(KAYAL, DARREN)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by MOD-PAC CORP.. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit)(GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
January 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MOD-PAC CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2019. (km)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOD-PAC CORP.. (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Mod-Pac Corp... (GOLOWSKI, ANTHONY)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. MOD-PAC CORP. served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (KAYAL, DARREN)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOD-PAC CORP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
December 12, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Darren Kayal on 12/11/2018 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
December 12, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
December 11, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. (KAYAL, DARREN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOD-PAC CORP, JOHN DOES 1-10 and ABC CORPS 1-10 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9231302) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAYAL, DARREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EAGLE SYSTEM, INC. v. MOD-PAC CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitiously named)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOD-PAC CORP.
Represented By: ANTHONY J. GOLOWSKI, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-10 (fictitious entities)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAGLE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: DARREN CHRISTOPHER KAYAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?