SIMONI v. JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SIMONI
Defendant: JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER and HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH
Case Number: 3:2018cv17714
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Defendants opposing Plaintiff's request to stay consideration of the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. (HONAN, WILLIAM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Nurse Requesting Stay of Action Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction re #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey Superior Court. (JARDIM, THOMAS)
February 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service . (JARDIM, THOMAS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STEPHEN SIMONI re #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey Superior Court (JARDIM, THOMAS)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(MCGINNIS, BRIAN)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER re #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey Superior Court with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCGINNIS, BRIAN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN JOHN SIMONI on behalf of STEPHEN SIMONI (SIMONI, STEPHEN)
January 28, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the #10 Amended Complaint filed by Thomas Jardim on 1/25/2019. Please be advised, for future reference, when filing an amended complaint please do not select the "All Defendants" radio button, instead choose the Defendants individually in the Select the Party box. This message is for informational purposes only. The docket text has been amended to list the individual Defendants names. (mmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, filed by STEPHEN SIMONI.(JARDIM, THOMAS) Modified on 1/28/2019 (mmh).
January 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service. Motion reset for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service Nurse's Request #6 to Stay the Motion to Dismiss Until Adjudication of the Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction Remains Pending. (SIMONI, STEPHEN)
January 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey Superior Court. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to New Jersey Superior Court by STEPHEN SIMONI. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(JARDIM, THOMAS)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Defendants Opposing Plaintiff's Request to Stay Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re #6 Letter, #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service. (MCGINNIS, BRIAN)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Nurse Requesting Stay of Motion to Dismiss Pending Adjudication of Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Third Circuit)(JARDIM, THOMAS)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Certificate of Service by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit A)(MCGINNIS, BRIAN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. JARDIM on behalf of STEPHEN SIMONI (JARDIM, THOMAS)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM M. HONAN on behalf of HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER (HONAN, WILLIAM)
January 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal submitted by Brian McGinnis on 12/28/2018 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney, Thomas C. Jardim, on Exhibit A that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
December 28, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH, JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER. (MCGINNIS, BRIAN)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH with Certificate of Service from Superior Court of New Jersey - Monmouth County, case number MON-L-004261-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9271458), filed by JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 11.2, #3 Exhibit A & B)(MCGINNIS, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMONI v. JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERSEY SHORE UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: BRIAN JOSEPH MCGINNIS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. HONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HACKENSACK MERIDIAN HEALTH
Represented By: BRIAN JOSEPH MCGINNIS
Represented By: WILLIAM M. HONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN SIMONI
Represented By: THOMAS C. JARDIM
Represented By: STEPHEN JOHN SIMONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?