MCNAMARA et al v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: COLLEEN KUDRICK and GERALD MCNAMARA
Defendant: BARRY J KRAUSER, JOHN MCCANN, JOSEPH PALUMBO, GURBIR S GREWAL, NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS, PAUL R. RODRIGUES and MICHELLE L MILLER
Case Number: 3:2019cv00173
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAUL R. RODRIGUES, GURBIR S GREWAL, BARRY J KRAUSER, JOSEPH PALUMBO, JOHN MCCANN, NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS, MICHELLE L MILLER. PAUL R. RODRIGUES waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; GURBIR S GREWAL waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; BARRY J KRAUSER waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; JOSEPH PALUMBO waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; JOHN MCCANN waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019; MICHELLE L MILLER waiver sent on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (LOPEZ, BARBARA)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by COLLEEN KUDRICK, GERALD MCNAMARA re #4 Amended Document, #2 Application/Petition, #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued, Rule 5.1(a) Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(BERRY, KEVIN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #2 Application/Petition, #1 Complaint, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(BERRY, KEVIN)
January 7, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Kevin Berry on 01/07/2019 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney, Kevin Berry that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR S GREWAL, BARRY J KRAUSER, JOHN MCCANN, MICHELLE L MILLER, NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS, JOSEPH PALUMBO, PAUL R. RODRIGUES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 7, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION/PETITION for by COLLEEN KUDRICK, GERALD MCNAMARA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit A-D)(BERRY, KEVIN)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR S GREWAL, BARRY J KRAUSER, JOHN MCCANN, MICHELLE L MILLER, NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS, JOSEPH PALUMBO, PAUL R. RODRIGUES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9286706), filed by COLLEEN KUDRICK, GERALD MCNAMARA.(BERRY, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNAMARA et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY J KRAUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCCANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PALUMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE BOARD OF REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL R. RODRIGUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE L MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLLEEN KUDRICK
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD MCNAMARA
Represented By: KEVIN F. BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?