AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY v. ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

Plaintiff: AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, AXIS INSURANCE CO., Carlton Wendell Maner, PRIME INSURANCE AGENCY, Albert A. Benchimol and AXIS CAPITAL
Case Number: 3:2019cv00220
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 First MOTION for Sanctions , #15 Counter MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Counter MOTION to Dismiss by ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Cert. of Service, #12 Proposed Order)(RAKOFSKY, JOSEPH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Sanctions by ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Cert. of Service, #12 Proposed Order)(RAKOFSKY, JOSEPH)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for April 2, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
March 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by AXIS CAPITAL, AXIS INSURANCE CO., AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, Albert A. Benchimol, Carlton Wendell Maner. Responses due by 3/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Counsel, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration)(MURPHY, COURTNEY)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 at 2:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/08/2019. (jem)
February 7, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by Courtney E. Murphy, Esq. on 2/06/2019 cannot be granted as requested because of the answer filed in docket entry #8 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jem)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #9 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, #8 Request for Default. (RAKOFSKY, JOSEPH)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, COUNTERCLAIM against AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, Carlton Wendell Maner, AXIS INSURANCE CO., AXIS CAPITAL, Albert A. Benchimol, PRIME INSURANCE AGENCY by ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Admission by Plaintiff's attorney, Courtney Murphy)(RAKOFSKY, JOSEPH)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Default by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY against Royale Property Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Affirmation, #3 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, COURTNEY)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (JACOBSON, THOMAS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS D. JACOBSON on behalf of AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY (JACOBSON, THOMAS)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 8, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(MURPHY, COURTNEY)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying AXIS CAPITAL HOLDINGS LIMITED as Corporate Parent.. (MURPHY, COURTNEY)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MURPHY, COURTNEY)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9288262), filed by AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(MURPHY, COURTNEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY v. ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ROYALE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH RAKOFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Represented By: THOMAS D. JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AXIS INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Carlton Wendell Maner
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PRIME INSURANCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Albert A. Benchimol
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: AXIS CAPITAL
Represented By: COURTNEY E. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?