SWED et al v. MANSOUR et al

Plaintiff: SWAR DEVELOPERS, LLC, KHDR SWED and RAFI SWED
Defendant: JONATHAN STRASSER, AHRON MANSOUR, ARM DEVELOPERS, LLC, RIFKA MANSOUR and ARM LAND GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00328
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Ocean County Courthouse118 Washington StreetToms River, NJ 08754 State No: OCN-C257-18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (mps)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER remanding this matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Chancery Division: Ocean County. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/16/2019. (mps)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Mansour Defendants' Counsel, Twersky PLLC regarding Remand to be So Ordered re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (NEUFELD, ILANA)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARM DEVELOPERS, LLC, AHRON MANSOUR, RIFKA MANSOUR. (NEUFELD, ILANA)
January 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ilana Neufeld, Esq. on 1/20/2019 was submitted as an attachment to the notice of removal. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under other filings, other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
January 10, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ARM DEVELOPERS, LLC, AHRON MANSOUR, RIFKA MANSOUR from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-C-257-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9296514), filed by ARM DEVELOPERS, LLC, AHRON MANSOUR, RIFKA MANSOUR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Superior Court Action, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Certification of Service in Superior Court Action, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Business Name Search Results, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Business Name Search Results, #5 Declaration Declaration of A. Mansour, #6 Declaration Declaration of R. Mansour, #7 Statement Removal Statement, #8 Statement Disclosure Statement)(NEUFELD, ILANA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SWED et al v. MANSOUR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN STRASSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHRON MANSOUR
Represented By: ILANA SARAH NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARM DEVELOPERS, LLC
Represented By: ILANA SARAH NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIFKA MANSOUR
Represented By: ILANA SARAH NEUFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARM LAND GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWAR DEVELOPERS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL I. PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHDR SWED
Represented By: PAUL I. PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFI SWED
Represented By: PAUL I. PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?