SCOTT et al v. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHARON SCOTT and MICHAEL SCOTT
Defendant: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., KATE SPADE & COMPANY LLC, CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY, IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, CHANEL, INC., BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC., FIFTH & PACIFIC COMPANIES COSMETICS, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., KATE SPADE & COMPANY OF NEW YORK, J.C. PENNY COMPANY, INC. and KATE SPADE LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion reset for 4/15/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
March 1, 2019 Filing 34 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by J.C. Penny Corporation, Inc.. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CONSENT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/28/2019. (mmh)
February 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by J.C. PENNY COMPANY, INC.. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kevin W. Turbert, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Complaint and Initial Fact Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Lisa Walton, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - J.C. Penney Corp.'s Certificate of Good Standing in Delaware, #5 Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(TURBERT, KEVIN)
February 26, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/26/2019. (ce3)
February 25, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Counsel Mailing List)(VIOLA, ROY)
February 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by SYED KAZIM RIZVI on behalf of CHANEL, INC. (RIZVI, SYED)
February 25, 2019 Filing 29 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Imerys Talc America, Inc. by IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.. (MCMEEKIN, JOHN)
February 22, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Robert Lytle, Esq. re: Call-in Information for Status Conf. Call 2.26.19. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 21, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 2/26/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert HAS BEEN CONVERTED TO A TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE. Mr. Lytle is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3)
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION to Remand (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 19, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification of Leah Kagan, #2 Exhibit Volume I, #3 Exhibit Volume II, #4 Exhibit Volume III, #5 Exhibit Volume IV, #6 Exhibit Volume V)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. KATZENSTEIN on behalf of FIFTH & PACIFIC COMPANIES COSMETICS, INC., KATE SPADE & COMPANY LLC, KATE SPADE & COMPANY OF NEW YORK, KATE SPADE LLC (KATZENSTEIN, DAVID)
February 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by ELI GRANEK on behalf of FIFTH & PACIFIC COMPANIES COSMETICS, INC., KATE SPADE & COMPANY LLC, KATE SPADE & COMPANY OF NEW YORK, KATE SPADE LLC (GRANEK, ELI)
February 19, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Robert E. Lytle re: Initial Conference and Joint Discovery Plan re #2 Notice of Hearing,. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/15/2019. (mmh)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 3/4/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/15/2019. (mmh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mmh)
February 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the request for issuance of a summons filed by Robert Lytle on 2/14/2019. Please be advised, for future reference, a request for a summons to be issued should be filed in letter format using the event Summons-Request for Issue found under Civil - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC, filed by MICHAEL SCOTT, SHARON SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 8, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Elizabeth Arden, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request to Adjourn Arden's Motion to Dismiss. (VIOLA, ROY)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.. (PATEL, POOJA)
February 7, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Robert Lytle Requesting 1-cycle Adj. re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 7, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC identifying Revlon Consumer Products Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (VIOLA, ROY)
February 7, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - This message is in reference to the #14 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter filed by Robert Lytle on 2/6/2019. Please be advised that the Clerk cannot grant this request as the motion has a return date of 2/19/2019, not 3/4/2019, and the request is being made out of time to adjourn the 2/19/2019 motion date. Please make an application to the Court to have the motion day reset. (mmh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (LYTLE, ROBERT)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by FIFTH & PACIFIC COMPANIES COSMETICS, INC., KATE SPADE & COMPANY LLC, KATE SPADE & COMPANY OF NEW YORK, KATE SPADE LLC. (GRANEK, ELI)
February 6, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manuel A. Guevara. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Manuel A. Guevara by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Roy F. Viola, Esq. in Support of Manuel A. Guevara PHV Application, #2 Certification of Manuel A. Guevara, Esq. in Support of PHV Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(VIOLA, ROY)
January 30, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by J.C. PENNY COMPANY, INC.. (TURBERT, KEVIN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Robert E. Lytle re #8 Letter. (LYTLE, ROBERT)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC re #3 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certificate of Service)(VIOLA, ROY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Robert E. Lytle, Esq. re: Stay or Adjournment of Eliz. Arden Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 5). (LYTLE, ROBERT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN ALLEN WEINER on behalf of COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEINER, STEVEN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN WILLIAM TURBERT on behalf of J.C. PENNY COMPANY, INC. (TURBERT, KEVIN)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC. Responses due by 2/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Roy F. Viola, Jr., Esq. in Support of EAI's MTD, #2 Brief in Support of EAI's MTD, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting EAI's MTD, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M)(VIOLA, ROY)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by POOJA R. PATEL on behalf of WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC. (PATEL, POOJA)
January 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LYTLE, ROBERT)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/26/2019 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_ordera@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3) (ce3)
January 10, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
January 10, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC from Middlesex County Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MID-L-8439-18AS. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9297175), filed by ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Counsel Mailing List)(VIOLA, ROY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT et al v. BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE SPADE & COMPANY LLC
Represented By: ELI GRANEK
Represented By: DAVID M. KATZENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH ARDEN, INC
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANEL, INC.
Represented By: SYED KAZIM RIZVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITTAKER CLARK & DANIELS, INC.
Represented By: POOJA R. PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIFTH & PACIFIC COMPANIES COSMETICS, INC.
Represented By: ELI GRANEK
Represented By: DAVID M. KATZENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE SPADE & COMPANY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: ELI GRANEK
Represented By: DAVID M. KATZENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. PENNY COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN WILLIAM TURBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE SPADE LLC
Represented By: ELI GRANEK
Represented By: DAVID M. KATZENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON SCOTT
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Represented By: LEAH CYLIA KAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SCOTT
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Represented By: LEAH CYLIA KAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?