DAWIDOWICZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: STANLEY DAWIDOWICZ
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER and GURBIR GREWAL
Petitioner: REBECCA S. PIERSON, ROBIN RAE KELLY, JACQUELINE A. SCHNEIDER, SHARLA WILTON, DIANE BROWN, CINDY COLBERT-HOCK, JEFFREY A. THORSON, MARK AGRO, DOUGLAS W. MCLAUGHLIN, TANYA THORSON, EMAD NASR, MELISSA JANE BAZEY, JEFFREY F. KNIRK, SR., GAIL F. MCLAUGHLIN, KRISTI BECKER, STEPHANIE LOBIGNAT, PAMELA MOLNAR, KEVIN J. TANK and KAREN DIANN DAVIS HUGHES
Case Number: 3:2019cv00510
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER ORDER that the motions to join filed in docket entries #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 & #22 as premature. It is Further Ordered that if any additional motions to join are filed prior to Defendants' answering Plaintiff's Complaint or, if Defendants move to dismiss in lieu of answering, prior to the District Court's decision, the motion to join will be denied without prejudice pursuant to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/1/2019. (km)
February 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to JOIN by EMAD NASR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
February 25, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STANLEY DAWIDOWICZ. STATE OF NEW JERSEY served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(km)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO JOIN by MARK AGRO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to join by RAE ROBIN KELLY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(km)
February 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO JOIN by MELISSA JANE BAZEY. (km)
February 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO JOIN by TANYA THORSON. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO JOIN by JEFFREY A. THORSON. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO JOIN by JACQUELINE A. SCHNEIDER. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO JOIN by REBECCA S. PIERSON. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO JOIN by DIANE BROWN. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO JOIN by DOUGLAS W. MCLAUGHLIN. (km)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO JOIN by GAIL F. MCLAUGHLIN. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Joinder. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Joinder. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Joinder. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO JOIN by KAREN DIANN DAVIS HUGHES. (km)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO JOIN by KEVIN J. TANK. (km)
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Joinder. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO JOIN by CINDY COLBERT-HOCK. (km)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO JOIN by JEFFREY F. KNIRK, SR. (km)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion reset for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION TO JOIN. Motion Reset for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
February 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Joinder. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Join by SHARLA WILTON. (km)
January 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Join. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Join. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Join, #4 MOTION to Join. Motions set for 2/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Join by STEPHANIE LOBIGNAT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Join by PAMELA MOLNAR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mmh)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to Join Case Number by KRISTI BECKER. (km)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GURBIR GREWAL, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summons sent Via USPS on 01/15/2019 (jmh)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GURBIR GREWAL, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW038413) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STANLEY DAWIDOWICZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 Summons 2)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAWIDOWICZ v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY DAWIDOWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR GREWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REBECCA S. PIERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROBIN RAE KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JACQUELINE A. SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHARLA WILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DIANE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CINDY COLBERT-HOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFREY A. THORSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARK AGRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DOUGLAS W. MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TANYA THORSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EMAD NASR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MELISSA JANE BAZEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JEFFREY F. KNIRK, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GAIL F. MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KRISTI BECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEPHANIE LOBIGNAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PAMELA MOLNAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN J. TANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KAREN DIANN DAVIS HUGHES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?