TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND v. GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND
Defendant: GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, RMTS, LLC and RONALD J. GECK
Case Number: 3:2019cv00750
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND. RONALD J. GECK waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; RMTS, LLC waiver sent on 1/23/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RONALD J. GECK, GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, RMTS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, )
January 22, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kas, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONALD J. GECK, GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, RMTS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9319567) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(BUSHINSKY, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND v. GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD J. GECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE REFRIGERATION, AIR CONDITIONING AND SERVICE DIV. (UA-NJ) WELFARE FUND
Represented By: STEVEN J. BUSHINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?