PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC v. PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56 et al
Plaintiff: PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC
Defendant: PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56, M&T BANK, TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND, AND ALL UNKNOWN OWNERS, COUNTY OF HUNTERDON, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BY THE SECRETARY OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIORNMENTAL PROTECTION, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.86 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 1.89 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-58.01 and VERIZON NEW JERSEY, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01117
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Defendants shall show cause on 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti why an Order should not be entered for the reasons stated in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/15/2019. (mps)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. RICH on behalf of M&T BANK (RICH, MICHAEL)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AND ALL UNKNOWN OWNERS, COUNTY OF HUNTERDON, M&T BANK, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.86 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 1.89 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-58.01, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BY THE SECRETARY OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIORNMENTAL PROTECTION, TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND, VERIZON NEW JERSEY, INC., filed by PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC.(GRAZIANO, JAMES)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COUNTY OF HUNTERDON, M&T BANK, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.86 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 1.89 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-58.01, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BY THE SECRETARY OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIORNMENTAL PROTECTION, TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND, VERIZON NEW JERSEY, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 25, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC. (GRAZIANO, JAMES)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AND ALL UNKNOWN OWNERS, COUNTY OF HUNTERDON, M&T BANK, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56, PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.86 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 1.89 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-58.01, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND, VERIZON NEW JERSEY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9335487), filed by PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Condemnation, #3 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #4 Brief, #5 Declaration of Robert W. Bucknam, Jr., Esq. and Exhibits, #6 Declaration of Jeffrey England and Exhibits, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(GRAZIANO, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC v. PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.76 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 2.19 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-56
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T BANK
Represented By: MICHAEL L. RICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AND ALL UNKNOWN OWNERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF HUNTERDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY, BY THE SECRETARY OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIORNMENTAL PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMANENT EASEMENT FOR 1.86 ACRES AND TEMPORARY EASEMENT FOR 1.89 ACRES IN HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, HUNTERDON COUNTY, NEW JERSEY, TAX PARCEL 1015-22-58.01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON NEW JERSEY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNEAST PIPELINE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: JAMES MICHAEL GRAZIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?