NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION v. 561 JERSEY AVE LLC
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Defendant: 561 JERSEY AVE LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv04875
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1348
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (mmh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (FORD, GERALD)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. 561 JERSEY AVE LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (FORD, GERALD)
February 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Return of Service filed by Gerald Ford on 2/19/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an Affidavit. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Return of Service USING Summons Returned Executed found under Civil - Initial Pleadings and Service - Service of Process. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of NRPC by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (FORD, GERALD)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 561 JERSEY AVE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
February 7, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (FORD, GERALD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 561 JERSEY AVE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9389043), filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FORD, GERALD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION v. 561 JERSEY AVE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: GERALD T. FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 561 JERSEY AVE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?