COHEN v. HORN et al
Plaintiff: BARRY COHEN
Defendant: THE HORN LAW GROUP, LLC and JEFF J. HORN
Case Number: 3:2019cv05604
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/17/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/11/2019. (mmh)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HELD ON THE REORD ON 4/11/2019. (Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff). (digitally recorded.) (ce3)
March 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan submitted by Jeffrey Leonard on 3/21/2019 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with his/her preferred practice as found on our website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mmh)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Joint Discovery Plan by JEFF J. HORN, THE HORN LAW GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service)(LEONARD, JEFFREY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JEFF J. HORN, THE HORN LAW GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Service)(STOMA, MEREDITH)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/11/2019 at 11:30 A.M.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/13/2019. (Mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(ce3)
February 13, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
February 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HORN LAW GROUP, LLC, JEFF J. HORN from Ocean, case number OCN-L-263-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9412940), filed by The Horn Law Group, LLC, Jeff J Horn.(LEONARD, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COHEN v. HORN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HORN LAW GROUP, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY SCOTT LEONARD
Represented By: MEREDITH KAPLAN STOMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF J. HORN
Represented By: JEFFREY SCOTT LEONARD
Represented By: MEREDITH KAPLAN STOMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?