HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION v. BROWN
Plaintiff: HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Defendant: CRYSTAL BROWN
Case Number: 3:2019cv06287
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from CB re #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CORRECTED ANSWER + COUNTERCLAIM REPLACING #5 )(EPSTEIN, JAMIE)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First COUNTERCLAIM against HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION by CRYSTAL BROWN.(EPSTEIN, JAMIE)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. CRYSTAL BROWN waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (THORNTON, DANIEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL FREDERICK THORNTON on behalf of HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION (THORNTON, DANIEL)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRYSTAL BROWN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
February 20, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jjc, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRYSTAL BROWN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9432660), filed by HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TOSCANO, MARK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION v. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPEWELL TOWNSHIP BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: MARK G. TOSCANO
Represented By: DANIEL FREDERICK THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRYSTAL BROWN
Represented By: JAMIE MARK EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?