SHARMA v. AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC et al
Plaintiff: DEBENDRA SHARMA
Defendant: AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM and JOHN F. THERO
Case Number: 3:2019cv06601
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Christina L. Costley, Filed, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Bruce G. Vanyo, Filed. Motion set for 5/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Bruce G. Vanyo, Filed by AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM, JOHN F. THERO. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Jonathan Rotenberg In Support, #2 Certification Of Bruce G. Vanyo In Support; With Certificate Of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate Of Service)(ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice For Christina L. Costley, Filed by AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM, JOHN F. THERO. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Jonathan Rotenberg In Support, #2 Certification Of Christina L. Costley In Support; With Certificate Of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate Of Service)(ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC. (ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN ROTENBERG on behalf of AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM, JOHN F. THERO (ROTENBERG, JONATHAN)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER that Defendants shall not be required to answer, plead or respond to any complaint, or otherwise respond to the complaint filed until this Court appoints a lead plaintiff and lead counsel. It is ORDERED that within 7 days after the Court appoints lead plaintiff and lead counsel, theparties will confer and submit a proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/21/2019. (km)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by DEBENDRA SHARMA. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBENDRA SHARMA. JOHN F. THERO served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBENDRA SHARMA. AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DEBENDRA SHARMA. STEVEN KETCHUM served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM, JOHN F. THERO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
February 25, 2019 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
February 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Incorrect vicinage chosen. Case has been copied to Trenton for assignment . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, by DEBENDRA SHARMA. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC, STEVEN KETCHUM, JOHN F. THERO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9441111) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DEBENDRA SHARMA. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Proposed Lead Plaintiff, Debendra Sharma, #2 Certification of Non-Arbitrability, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHARMA v. AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMARIN CORPORATION, PLC
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN KETCHUM
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. THERO
Represented By: JONATHAN ROTENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBENDRA SHARMA
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?