MURAKAMI v. SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. et al

Plaintiff: YUICHI MURAKAMI
Defendant: GREGORY RUSH, ALISTAIR MACDONALD, JASON MEGGS and SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.
Intervenor: EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND and SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND
Case Number: 3:2019cv07377
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by YUICHI MURAKAMI re #6 MOTION to Intervene (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND, SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND re #6 MOTION to Intervene Reply in Further Support of Texas Pension Funds' Motion to Intervene, Strike the Murakami Lead Plaintiff Deadline, and Transfer to the Eastern District of North Carolina (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion filed by SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. re #6 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Syneos Health Inc. 2018 Form 10-K, #2 Exhibit 2 - Syneos Health Inc. March 18, 2019 Q4 2018 Earnings Call Transcript)(FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.. (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY on behalf of SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. (FRAWLEY, BRIAN)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by YUICHI MURAKAMI re #6 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID R. BUCHANAN on behalf of EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND, SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND (BUCHANAN, DAVID)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER on behalf of EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND, SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND, EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALISTAIR MACDONALD, JASON MEGGS, GREGORY RUSH, SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
March 4, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by YUICHI MURAKAMI. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by YUICHI MURAKAMI. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by YUICHI MURAKAMI as to ALISTAIR MACDONALD, JASON MEGGS, GREGORY RUSH, SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALISTAIR MACDONALD, JASON MEGGS, GREGORY RUSH, SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9461229) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YUICHI MURAKAMI. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURAKAMI v. SYNEOS HEALTH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY RUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALISTAIR MACDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON MEGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNEOS HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN THOMAS FRAWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUICHI MURAKAMI
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: EL PASO FIREMEN & POLICEMEN'S PENSION FUND
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SAN ANTONIO FIRE & POLICE PENSION FUND
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER
Represented By: DAVID R. BUCHANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?