CLARK v. DETZKY

Plaintiff: ANTHONY S. CLARK
Defendant: JOSHUA D. DETZKY and DETECTIVE JESSE ORBACH
Case Number: 3:2019cv07855
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Anthony Clark to Judge Martinotti. (mmh)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Anthony Clark to Judge Martinotti. (mmh)
March 28, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed.(mmh)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED; that the Amended Complaint shall be filed; that SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE, at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/28/2019. (mmh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Affidavit of Poverty and Account Certification by ANTHONY S. CLARK. (mmh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT Received against JOSHUA D. DETZKY, JESSE ORBACH, filed by ANTHONY S. CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(mmh)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Order, #4 Envelope)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. DETZKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY S. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA D. DETZKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE JESSE ORBACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?