MAY v. SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MAY
Defendant: VAPOR DNA, JOHN DOES 1-100, LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC., VAPORDNA.COM, Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok, Hohm Tech and Home Tech, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. and SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07963
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. REHBERGER on behalf of SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD. (REHBERGER, JAMES)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER: The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 9/30/2020, with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 51 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Home Tech, Inc., filed by SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD., SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2020. Defendant Samsung SDI Co. LTD to file Third Party Complaint by 7/22/2020; the schedule shall be addressed after the Third Party has filed an answer. (mm)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER - Status Conference via telephone set for July 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Dial-in information shall be provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
May 15, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TORI S. LEVINE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
May 14, 2020 Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tori S. Levine to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10814680.) (LEE, SUNA)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER- The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 6/22/2020, with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
May 7, 2020 Filing 47 Letter from Domenic B. Sanginiti, Esq.. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: In light of the current pandemic involving COVID-19, a paper Order regarding Tori S. Levines request to be admitted pro hac vice shall not be entered. Instead, this entry shall serve to adopt the proposed consent order submitted to Chambers on May 1, 2020. Ms. Levine is directed to comply with all of the terms outlined in that order. It is further ordered that Ms. Levine disclose to the Court each bar in which she is a member in good standing including the year of admission and the name and address of the official or office maintaining the roll of such members of its bar pursuant to L. Civ. R. 101.1(c)(1). Ms. Levine is also directed to make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the Court within twenty (20) days of the entry of this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER- The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 5/13/2020, with a written status update. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
March 16, 2020 Filing 44 Letter from Domenic B. Sanginiti, Jr., Esq.. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
February 4, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Hohm Tech, Inc. Only by Hohm Tech. (TURNER, LINTON)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER ORDER granting an extension of time to conduct the inspection/testing to early April and a status update is to be submitted by 03/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 01/31/2020. (jdb)
January 29, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. filed by Plaintiff (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
January 8, 2020 Filing 40 Letter from Domenic B. Sanginiti, Jr., Esq.. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
November 19, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/19/2019. Discovery testing of battery is to be conducted by 1/31/2020. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 2/28/2020, with a written status update regarding the testing. (mm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 39 Proposed Pretrial Order signed by Domenic B. Sanginiti by All Plaintiffs. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
October 22, 2019 Filing 38 Proposed Pretrial Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
October 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #38 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan submitted by Domenic Sanginiti on 10/22/2019 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 HOHM TECH, INC. ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Hohm Tech by Hohm Tech.(TURNER, LINTON)
September 27, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC..(LEE, SUNA)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2019 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/25/2019. (jdb) (Main Document 35 replaced on 10/11/2019) (jmh).
September 20, 2019 Filing 34 Letter from Domenic B. Sanginiti, Jr., Esquire. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
September 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by Christopher May on 09/12/2019 cannot be granted as requested because Defendant has not been properly and completely served. Please refer to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 4(i). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 Request for Default by CHRISTOPHER MAY against Hohm Tech. (Attachments: #1 Request for Default on def Hohm Tech)(SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension of time to respond. Defendants' to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/28/2019. (km)
August 27, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Suna Lee. (LEE, SUNA)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to extend time to respond. Defendant's time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint is extended by 20 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/15/2019. (km)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Hohm Tech, LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC., Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok, VAPOR DNA, VAPORDNA.COM by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Hohm Tech, JOHN DOES 1-100, LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC., Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok, VAPOR DNA, VAPORDNA.COM by SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim entered in docket entries #27 and #28 submitted by Michael Trucillo on 8/14/2019 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Suna Lee re #25 Amended Complaint. (LEE, SUNA)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok, filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY.(SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Plaintiff must file a Second Amended Complaint within 15 days; It is ORDERED that the #12 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/18/2019. (km)
July 18, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Telephone Conference held on 7/18/2019 Re: Motion #12 to Dismiss. Court Denied Motion; Plaintiff given leave to file Amended Complaint within 15 days. Order to be filed. (jmm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (LEE, SUNA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Suna Lee)(LEE, SUNA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Samsung SDI CO., Ltd and Samsung SDI America, Inc... (TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
June 19, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. and SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/5/2019. (km)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. TRUCILLO on behalf of SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD. (TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER ORDER Granting Counsel for Plaintiff's request for a 4 week adjournment on the Defendants #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/21/2019. (km)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Letter. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for May 23, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Certification of Lan Li, #3 Certificate of Service of Suna Lee, #4 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(LEE, SUNA)
May 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER that the 5/2/2019 initial scheduling conference is adjourned to 5/23/2019 at 12:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/17/2019. (mmh)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiff against Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok, Hohm Tech, filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY.(SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Samsung Electronics America, Inc. on 03/22/2019, filed by CHRISTOPHER MAY. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER that Defendant Lan & Mike International Trading, Inc. be permitted to file an Answer, Reply, or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Co-Defendants' Cross-Claims, if any, within 30 days of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/21/2019. (km)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER granting leave to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/15/2019. (km)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Domenic B. Sanginiti, Jr., Esq. seeking leave to file Amended Pleading. (SANGINITI, DOMENIC)
March 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/27/2019. (km)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC. (LEE, SUNA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Lan & Mike International Trading, Inc., d/b/a "VaporDNA" and improperly plead as "VaporDNA" and "VaporDNA.com".. (LEE, SUNA)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/6/2019. (km)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC.. (LEE, SUNA)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC. from Mercer County Superior Court, case number MER-L-1941-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9476078), filed by LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(LEE, SUNA)
March 6, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
March 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal submitted by Suna Lee on 03/06/2019 appears to have address information on Exhibit A as to Plaintiff's attorney Domenic Sanginiti that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAY v. SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAPOR DNA
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAN & MIKE INTERNATIONAL TRADING, INC.
Represented By: SUNA LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAPORDNA.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen IVPS Technology Co., LTD d/b/a Smok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hohm Tech
Represented By: LINTON W. TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Tech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TRUCILLO
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SAMSUNG SDI CO. LTD.
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TRUCILLO
Represented By: JAMES S. REHBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MAY
Represented By: DOMENIC B. SANGINITI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?