STATE OF NEW JERSEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 3:2019cv12218
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(MYERS, STEVEN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIE LINETTE SOUEID on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (SOUEID, MARIE)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STATE OF NEW JERSEY , AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on U.S. Dept. of Justice; William Barr; and USAO DNJ on May 8, 2019, filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY. (MORAMARCO, GLENN)
June 6, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2019. (jem)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney STEVEN ANDREW MYERS for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE added. (MYERS, STEVEN)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Intervention by Harold P. Kupersmit. (jem)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, )
May 7, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kas, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by STATE OF NEW JERSEY as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MORAMARCO, GLENN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing and Admin fee $ 400 TRE102120), filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY.(MORAMARCO, GLENN) Modified on 5/7/2019 to add receipt number (jjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF NEW JERSEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: GLENN J. MORAMARCO
Represented By: MARIE LINETTE SOUEID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: STEVEN ANDREW MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?