ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al v. AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED and ASTRAZENECA AB
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. and AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Case Number: 3:2019cv12567
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #9 Answer submitted by Marc Youngelson, Esq. on 6/25/2019 did not contain a signature. Please resubmit the document with a proper signature. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov(ce3)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Marc D. Youngelson, Esq. re #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. identifying Aurobindo Ltd as Corporate Parent.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Aurobindo's ANSWER to Complaint by Marc D. Youngelson, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(YOUNGELSON, MARC)
June 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/25/2019. (jem)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendant, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc and Aurobindo Pharma Limited.. (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. YOUNGELSON on behalf of All Defendants (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA AB. AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019; AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 AO120 Patent Form filed. (kas, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kas, )
May 16, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kas, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RAVIN R. PATEL on behalf of ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED (PATEL, RAVIN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASTRAZENECA AB, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED identifying AstraZeneca PLC as Corporate Parent.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9669007), filed by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, ASTRAZENECA AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al v. AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRAZENECA AB
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?