WEST WINDSOR PLAINSBORO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION v. D.D. AND D.D.
Plaintiff: WEST WINDSOR PLAINSBORO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Defendant: D.D. AND D.D.
Case Number: 3:2019cv12816
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH W. MONTGOMERY on behalf of D.D. AND D.D. (MONTGOMERY, JOSEPH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D.D. AND D.D.. D.D. AND D.D. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (MONTGOMERY, JOSEPH)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to D.D. AND D.D.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
May 23, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jmh)
May 23, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: This case was opened with a Miscellaneous docket number. Be careful when choosing an office. The only acceptable choices for the office drop down are Camden, Trenton and Newark. This case has been copied with the new docket number of 3:19-cv-12816. Counsel added for the defendant has been deleted. Defense counsel will need to file a notice of appearance if he/she is looking to represent the defendant in this matter. The complaint states this action is an appeal from the Final Decision of an Administrative Law Judge, therefore the Nature of Suit selected should have been 899 - Administrative procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D.D. AND D.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9686625), filed by WEST WINDSOR PLAINSBORO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(HARRISON, ERIC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST WINDSOR PLAINSBORO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION v. D.D. AND D.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST WINDSOR PLAINSBORO REGIONAL SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ERIC L. HARRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.D. AND D.D.
Represented By: JOSEPH W. MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?