NEBLETT v. PELLEGRINO et al
Plaintiff: CONRAD NEBLETT
Defendant: CINDY DYE, MICHELLE SMITH, TYRONE YOUNG, JESSE FAASEN, SHAUN GOLDEN, KATIE GUMMER, MICHAEL PELLEGRINO and CHRISTINE GIORDANO-HANLON
Case Number: 3:2019cv13318
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to #1 Complaint by CONRAD NEBLETT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jem)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER that the Plaintiff's letter request is denied without prejudice. The Court will entertain an application for conference when all parties have been served. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/14/019. (jem)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Letter submission from CONRAD NEBLETT requesting a conference with Judge Brian Martinotti. (jem)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CINDY DYE, JESSE FAASEN, CHRISTINE GIORDANO-HANLON, SHAUN GOLDEN, KATIE GUMMER, MICHAEL PELLEGRINO, MICHELLE SMITH, TYRONE YOUNG. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Summons sent via USPS on 6/4/2019. (in-jdb, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CINDY DYE, JESSE FAASEN, CHRISTINE GIORDANO-HANLON, SHAUN GOLDEN, KATIE GUMMER, MICHAEL PELLEGRINO, MICHELLE SMITH, TYRONE YOUNG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number TRE102840), filed by CONRAD NEBLETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(in-jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEBLETT v. PELLEGRINO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINDY DYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TYRONE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSE FAASEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAUN GOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATIE GUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PELLEGRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE GIORDANO-HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONRAD NEBLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?