PIZARRO v. THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Plaintiff: PEDRO J. PIZARRO
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF, DOES 1-10, ROES 1-10, SHERIFF OF MERCER COUNTY OCCUPIED BY SHERIFF JOHN A. KEMLER, SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI, MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF, SHERIFF OF THE COUNTY OF MERCER, JOHN A. KEMLER and MARIO URLA
Case Number: 3:2019cv13523
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to MARIO URLA. (km)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. JOHN A. KEMLER served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (km)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN A. KEMLER, SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI, THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF, MARIO URLA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of USM (km)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Letter regarding service from Pedro J. Pizarro. (km)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (km)
June 11, 2019 COMPLAINT filed, re: docket entry #1 .(km)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting #1 Application to proceed without payment of fees. It is Ordered that the Clerk shall file the complaint. It is Further Ordered that the USM shall serve the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/11/2019. (km)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Application IFP, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Annex A, #6 Annex B, #7 Annex C, #8 Annex D)(jmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIZARRO v. THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OF MERCER COUNTY OCCUPIED BY SHERIFF JOHN A. KEMLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN F. NAPIERKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERIFF OF THE COUNTY OF MERCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. KEMLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO URLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO J. PIZARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?