HAGER et al v. SELENE FINANCE LP et al
Plaintiff: DONALD HAGER and CARRIE HAGER
Defendant: SELENE FINANCE LP, DOES 1-10 and CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv13650
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by SELENE FINANCE LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. Steinlight, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Brief, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CITIMORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Memorandum of Law, #14 Certificate of Service)(BRENNER, SCOTT)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIMORTGAGE, INC. identifying Citibank, N.A. as Corporate Parent.. (BRENNER, SCOTT)
July 9, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SELENE FINANCE LP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 07/24/2019. (jmh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN STEINLIGHT on behalf of SELENE FINANCE LP (STEINLIGHT, STEPHEN)
July 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITIMORTGAGE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/24/2019. (km)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Application for An Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint.. (BRENNER, SCOTT)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT BRADLEY BRENNER on behalf of CITIMORTGAGE, INC. (BRENNER, SCOTT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIMORTGAGE, INC., DOES 1-10, SELENE FINANCE LP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Consent and Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically filed by CARRIE HAGER. (jdb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITIMORTGAGE, INC., DOES 1-10, SELENE FINANCE LP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW039781) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DONALD HAGER, CARRIE HAGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAGER et al v. SELENE FINANCE LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELENE FINANCE LP
Represented By: STEPHEN STEINLIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIMORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT BRADLEY BRENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE HAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?