HUNT v. P & G TRADING COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: DUANE HUNT
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 and P & G TRADING COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2019cv13875
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time within which Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; deadline extended to 9/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/12/2019. (km)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Consent Order Extending Defendant's Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by P & G TRADING COMPANY. (EISENMANN, KATHERYN)
July 26, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by P & G TRADING COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/12/2019. (jmh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney KATHERYN EISENMANN for P & G TRADING COMPANY added. (EISENMANN, KATHERYN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DUANE HUNT. All Defendants. (ARORA, MANALI)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHN DOES 1-10, P & G TRADING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jdb)
June 18, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jdb)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1-10, P & G TRADING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9746857) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DUANE HUNT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(ARORA, MANALI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUNT v. P & G TRADING COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & G TRADING COMPANY
Represented By: KATHERYN EISENMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE HUNT
Represented By: MANALI SHAH ARORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?