Venera Lo Re v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Venera Lo Re
Defendant: Dr. Richard Patrick Sullivan, MD Sylvia Park, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Alexander Medical Group, PC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC and Rochester Regional Health
Case Number: 3:2019cv14108
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06170. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of New Jersey. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (LB)
May 19, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion was submitted without roal argument on 5/16/2019 re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. (JMC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand REPLY MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION TO DROP THE MEDICAL DEFENDANTS OR SEVER THE CLAIMS AGAINST THEM UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Murdica, James)
May 13, 2019 E-Filing Notification: FYI #26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever and #27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever appear to be duplicate filings. (TF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion was submitted without oral argument on 5/8/2019 re #2 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC. (JMC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Sylvia Park. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Brief in Support of Cross-Motion)(Bernacki, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Alexander Medical Group, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Brief in Support of Cross-Motion)(Bernacki, Thomas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Venera Lo Re. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Kelly)
May 8, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Richard Patrick Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Roach, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Janssen Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is extended to the later of July 1, 2019 or 30 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules on Plaintiff's pending Motion to Vacate. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 4/30/19. (JMC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Further Extending Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC and Johnson & Johnson's Time to Respond to the Complaint by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Murdica, James)
April 29, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael A. Telesca: Motion was submitted without oral argument on 4/29/2019 re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, Monroe County filed by Venera Lo Re. (JMC)
April 24, 2019 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Responses due by 5/8/2019. Replies due by 5/15/2019. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 5/16/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC)
April 24, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #20 CROSS MOTION to Sever. Modified entry to add Cross Motion. (TF)
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 CROSS MOTION to Sever the Claims against Medical Defendants or Drop Medical Defendants Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21 and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Murdica, James) Modified on 4/24/2019 (TF).
April 23, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Incorrect.pdf file attached to entry. Action required: re-file entry with correct attachment and new proof of service #19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sylvia Park. (TF)
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sylvia Park. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernacki, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Medical Group, PC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernacki, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rochester Regional Health. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Crowley, Emily)
April 17, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Bernacki on behalf of Sylvia Park (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernacki, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Bernacki on behalf of Alexander Medical Group, PC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernacki, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Paul Kroetsch on behalf of Richard Patrick Sullivan (Kroetsch, Bryan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Catherine McGorry on behalf of Richard Patrick Sullivan (McGorry, Mollie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Roach on behalf of Richard Patrick Sullivan (Roach, Michael)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings. Responses due by 4/28/2019. Replies due by 5/6/2019. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 5/8/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, Monroe County. Responses due by 4/23/2019. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 4/29/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Supreme Court, Monroe County by Venera Lo Re. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion, #2 Appendix Attachment 1 (Brief in Support of Vacating CTO), #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Kelly)
April 3, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Venera Lo Re. Amended Certificate of Service of #9 Affirmation in Response to Motion for Stay. Modified on 4/3/2019 to link document. (TF)
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Venera Lo Re. Amended Certificate of Service of #9 Affirmation in Response to Motion for Stay. Corrects the document which was electronically served. (Wolford, Kelly) Modified on 4/3/2019 (TF).
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIRMATION signed by Kelly C. Wolford filed by Venera Lo Re Affirmation in Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Venera Lo Re. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Kelly)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Christine Wolford on behalf of Venera Lo Re (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wolford, Kelly)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rochester Regional Health re #6 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Crowley, Emily)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Rochester Regional Health. (Crowley, Emily)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Durki Crowley on behalf of Rochester Regional Health (Crowley, Emily)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to complaint until April 28, 2019. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 3/25/19. (JMC)
March 23, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION extending time to respond to complaint by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Murdica, James)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE: Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings. Responses due by 4/1/2019. Replies due by 4/8/2019. Motion will be submitted without oral argument on 4/18/2019 before Hon. Michael A. Telesca. No court appearances are required. (JMC)
March 15, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit)(Murdica, James)
March 8, 2019 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action emailed to the MDLl (TF)
March 8, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
March 8, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
March 8, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Michael A. Telesca. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLP and Johnson & Johnson from State of New York Supreme Court County of Monroe, case number E2019000845. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3382535), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index Identifying Documents Filed/Served in State Court, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Corporate Disclosure, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murdica, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venera Lo Re v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Patrick Sullivan
Represented By: Michael J. Roach
Represented By: Mollie Catherine McGorry
Represented By: Bryan Paul Kroetsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Sylvia Park
Represented By: Thomas M. Bernacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES F. MURDICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Represented By: JAMES F. MURDICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Medical Group, PC
Represented By: Thomas M. Bernacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: JAMES F. MURDICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Regional Health
Represented By: Emily Durki Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venera Lo Re
Represented By: Kelly Christine Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?