Harty v. Spark Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Harty
Defendant: SPARK ENERGY, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv14114
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Matthew R. Mendelsohn to Hon. Lois H Goodman, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Matthew R. Mendelsohn, #2 Certification of Richard R. Gordon, #3 Certification of Robert C. Thomas, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(MENDELSOHN, MATTHEW)
July 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW ROSS MENDELSOHN on behalf of Michael Harty (MENDELSOHN, MATTHEW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by EZRA DODD CHURCH on behalf of SPARK ENERGY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHURCH, EZRA)
June 24, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02151. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 TRANSFERRED to the District of New Jersey the electronic record. (gcy, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Motion hearing held 6/19/2019. Defendant's unopposed motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to transfer the above-captioned action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, where a near-identical previously filed case, Rolland v. Spark Energy, LLC, Case No. 17-2680 (D.N.J.), is currently pending is granted. #12 Enter Order. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action to the District of New Jersey forthwith. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/19/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY by Spark Energy, LLC to MOTION by Defendant Spark Energy, LLC to transfer case to the District of New Jersey and to Defer Case Deadlines #12 (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Michael Harty to MOTION by Defendant Spark Energy, LLC to transfer case to the District of New Jersey and to Defer Case Deadlines #12 (Gordon, Richard)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By agreement of the parties, the 6/18/2019 motion hearing is vacated and reset for 6/19/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:By agreement of the parties, the 6/10/2019 notice motion date is vacated and reset to 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. as to defendant's motion to transfer #12 .Mailed notice (srn, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice #11 is granted; Attorney Veronica Jean Lew for Spark Energy, LLC added. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted; Attorney Michelle D. Pector for Spark Energy, LLC added. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted; Attorney Ezra D. Church for Spark Energy, LLC added. Mailed notice (srn, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Spark Energy, LLC (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Tinos Diamantatos for presentment of motion to transfer case #12 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Spark Energy, LLC in support of motion to transfer case #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Spark Energy, LLC to transfer case to the District of New Jersey and to Defer Case Deadlines (Diamantatos, Tinos)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15890602. (Lew, Veronica)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15890597. (Pector, Michelle)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15890587. (Church, Ezra)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Spark Energy, LLC by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Harty by Robert Carl Thomas (Thomas, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 Appearance by Michael Harty (Thomas, Robert)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance by Robert C. Thomas. (Thomas, Robert) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 5/1/2019 (jh, ).
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Harty. Spark Energy, LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Gordon, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Harty by Richard R Gordon (Gordon, Richard)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ew, )
March 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action & Jury Demand filed by Michael Harty; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15644782. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gordon, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harty v. Spark Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPARK ENERGY, LLC
Represented By: Ezra D. Church
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Michelle D. Pector
Represented By: Veronica Jean Lew
Represented By: EZRA DODD CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harty
Represented By: Richard R Gordon
Represented By: Robert Carl Thomas
Represented By: MATTHEW ROSS MENDELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?