SHAKOV v. AETNA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EMIL SHAKOV, M.D.
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurnance Co., JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10, AETNA, INC. and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv14118
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/29/2019. (jem)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Order for Dismissal by AETNA, INC.. (KELLY, PAUL)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/15/19. (adi, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Paul D. Kelly, Esquire. (KELLY, PAUL)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/10/19. (if, )
June 24, 2019 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdb)
June 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
June 21, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Plaintiff, Emil Shakov, was added to the docket as a DEFENDANT. Please make sure to change the role when adding parties. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurnance Co. from Ocean County Superior Court, case number OCN-L-252-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9761333), filed by Aetna Life Insurnance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Corporate Disclosure, #9 Answer)(KELLY, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAKOV v. AETNA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurnance Co.
Represented By: PAUL D. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA, INC.
Represented By: PAUL D. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMIL SHAKOV, M.D.
Represented By: ROSANNE PALUMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?