BURKE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: ANGELA BURKE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 3:2019cv14148
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff setting forth primary contentions and arguments pursuant to Local Rule 9.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MELLO, TIMOTHY)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY JOSEPH MELLO on behalf of ANGELA BURKE (MELLO, TIMOTHY)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13)(ROACH, PATRICK)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK EUGENE ROACH on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (ROACH, PATRICK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ANGELA BURKE. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 7/2/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of service on U S Atty Carpenito, #2 Proof of Service on U S Attorney General, #3 Proof of Service on General Counsel)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
June 26, 2019 COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 for Complaint.(jem)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Granting #2 Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/26/2019. (jem)
June 25, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson added. (jdb)
June 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information needs to be added to the docket when filing a case. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by ANGELA BURKE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jdb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURKE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: PATRICK EUGENE ROACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA BURKE
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH MELLO
Represented By: LAUREN S. TOVINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?