GRAY v. TRUCILLO et al
Plaintiff: AARON GRAY
Defendant: CHARLES TRUCILLO, RED BANK TOWNSHIP, MONMOUTH COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE, CATHLEEN GERBER, RED BANK POLICE DEPARTMENT and THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 3:2019cv14446
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 All returned mail - #2 #7 #8 - has been resent to plaintiff's address listed on Amended Complaint. (jmh)
August 26, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED - Please see Docket Entry #4 (jmh)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. It is further Ordered that the time to serve process under FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) is hereby extended to the date 90 days after the Court permits the Amended Complaint to proceed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 08/15/2019. (jmh)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron Gray. (jmh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron Gray. (jmh)
August 6, 2019 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Application to Proceed IFP filed on 07/26/2019 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (dpw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Aaron Gray. (jmh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by AARON GRAY. (jmh)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CATHLEEN GERBER, MONMOUTH COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE, RED BANK POLICE DEPARTMENT, RED BANK TOWNSHIP, CHARLES TRUCILLO, THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, filed by AARON GRAY. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(jmh)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the court in writing withing 30 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk of the Court has mailed a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 07/18/2019. (jmh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AARON GRAY (km)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. TRUCILLO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES TRUCILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED BANK TOWNSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONMOUTH COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHLEEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RED BANK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?