MURGULY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER Z. MURGULY
Defendant: CHASE BANK, TCF NATIONAL BANK, KELLY LOCKE, GOOGLE LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv14471
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting TCF Nation Bank's request for leave to appear via telephone for the 9/3/2019 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/26/2019. (km)
August 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #24 Request for leave to appear via telephone filed by Daniel C. Adams on 8/26/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and will forward this request to Chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION Requesting that a Representative from TCF National Bank be permitted to appear by telephone for settlement conference on September 3, 2019 by TCF NATIONAL BANK. (ADAMS, DANIEL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Seal Financial Account Numbers in Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/19/2019. (km)
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Seal Financial Account Numbers in Complaint. Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Seal Financial Account Numbers in Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Basiak Jr., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER that the representative from Google may appear telephonically at the 9/3/2019 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/15/2019. (km)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Michelle Sekowski to Judge Quraishi regarding September 3, 2019 Settlement Conference re #17 Order, Set Hearings. (SEKOWSKI, MICHELLE)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER permitting the Federal Bureau of Investigation to appear by telephone for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/12/2019. (km)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office Regarding Sept. 3, 2019 Settlement Conference re #17 Order, Set Hearings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Settlement Conference for 9/3/2019 12:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/8/2019. (km)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Michelle E. Tarson. (TARSON, MICHELLE)
July 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative, Under Rule 12(b)(6). Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) or, in the Alternative, Under Rule 12(b)(6) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. Responses due by 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of William L. Harris, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BLAKE MOLLICK on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (MOLLICK, JASON)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TCF NATIONAL BANK identifying TCF Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (ADAMS, DANIEL)
July 8, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer. Motion reset for 8/5/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 8, 2019 This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (jjc, )
July 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ALEXANDER Z. MURGULY has been DENIED. (km)
July 8, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer. Motion set for 8/15/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by GOOGLE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Michelle Sekowski, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SEKOWSKI, MICHELLE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE M. SEKOWSKI on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEKOWSKI, MICHELLE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE M. SEKOWSKI on behalf of GOOGLE LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEKOWSKI, MICHELLE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE LLC identifying XXVI Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEKOWSKI, MICHELLE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHASE BANK identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TARSON, MICHELLE)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by TCF NATIONAL BANK.(ADAMS, DANIEL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL C. ADAMS on behalf of TCF NATIONAL BANK (ADAMS, DANIEL)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by CHASE BANK.(TARSON, MICHELLE)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS EDWARD STAGG on behalf of CHASE BANK (STAGG, THOMAS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE E. TARSON on behalf of CHASE BANK (TARSON, MICHELLE)
June 28, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number HNT-DC-000742-19., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURGULY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK
Represented By: THOMAS EDWARD STAGG
Represented By: MICHELLE E. TARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: DANIEL C. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY LOCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE LLC
Represented By: MICHELLE M. SEKOWSKI
Represented By: JASON BLAKE MOLLICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER Z. MURGULY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?