NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC., DEFLECTO, INC., ABC CORPORATION 1-20 and MXD GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv14713
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER ORDER resetting the Initial Conference to 9/30/2019 01:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/21/2019. (km)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Dennis J. Crawford, re: Request for Adjournment of Initial Scheduling Conference to a later date. (CRAWFORD, DENNIS)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , Separate Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against DEFLECTO, INC., MXD GROUP, INC. by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(CORONATO, WILFRED)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY TUCKER WEATHERSTON on behalf of DEFLECTO, INC. (WEATHERSTON, JAY)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MXD Group, Inc. n/k/a Ryder Last Mile, Inc., filed by NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY.(CRAWFORD, DENNIS)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS J. CRAWFORD on behalf of NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY (CRAWFORD, DENNIS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against DEFLECTO, INC. by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC..(CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/16/2019. (km)
July 16, 2019 This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni to Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise advised by Judge Quraishi's chambers, all conferences set by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni shall be conducted by Judge Quraishi on the previously scheduled date and time. (jjc, )
July 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/24/2019. (km)
July 8, 2019 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey: Ocean County, case number OCN-L-1383-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9791856), filed by ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Joinder in Removal of Defendant Deflecto, LLC (Improperly Pleaded as Deflecto, Inc.), #3 Certificate of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY v. ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEFLECTO, INC.
Represented By: JAY TUCKER WEATHERSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXD GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY MANUFACTURERS INSURANCE GROUP a/s/o KRISTEN R. MCCLUSKEY
Represented By: DENNIS J. CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?